EP2081852 - CONSUMABLES AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tymatic Ltd. Luckhurst Place, East Street Mayfield, East Sussex TN20 6RJ / GB | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNES, Graham Frank Quaker's Yard 108 West Street Dormansland Lingfield Surrey RH7 6QT / GB | 02 /
COLES, Ian David 1 Priory Close Sompting West Sussex BN15 0EB / GB | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Adrian James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | Samuels, Adrian James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Samuels, Adrian James Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07824346.6 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007GB04102 | Priority number, date | GB20060021428 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: GB 0621428 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050143 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081852 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081852 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/02, B25B23/06, B41J2/175, E04G21/12 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/1755 (EP,US);
B65D83/02 (EP,BR,US);
B65B13/285 (BR,US);
B65B13/027 (BR,US);
B65B13/185 (BR,US);
E04G21/122 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIKATION VON VERBRAUCHSGEGENSTÄNDEN | [2009/31] | English: | CONSUMABLES AUTHENTICATION | [2009/31] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION DE PRODUITS CONSOMMABLES | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2010 | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | LU | 29.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/14] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9302816 (GATEWAY CONSTR CO [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US2002188259 (HICKLE RANDALL S [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067]; figure 8 *; | [A]WO03060817 (FLYING NULL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 10, line 9 - line 15 *; | [A]EP1346923 (EM MICROELECTRONIC MARIN SA [CH]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0016] , [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004046003 (VETTER & CO APOTHEKER [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 * |