EP1992100 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ADAPTIVE NETWORK TECHNIQUE USING ISOCHRONOUS TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garmin Switzerland GmbH Vorstadt 40/42 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2010/43] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Garmin Ltd. PO Box 30464 SMB 5th Floor, Harbour Place 103 South Church Street George Town / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, Rodney, D. 194 Harvest Park Circle N.e. Calgary, Alberta T3K 4M9 / CA | 02 /
ROONEY, James, K. Box 19 Site 9 RR2 Cochrane, Alberta T4C 1A2 / CA | 03 /
FUNG, Jeffrey, Y., K. 3316 Barr Road N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2L 1MB / CA | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/47] | Huber, Arnulf Uexküll & Stolberg, Patentanwälte, Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07825229.3 | 05.03.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007IB02871 | Priority number, date | US20060778695P | 03.03.2006 Original published format: US 778695 P | US20070681692 | 02.03.2007 Original published format: US 681692 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008010092 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1992100 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992100 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04W4/00, H04B7/26 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
H04W52/028 (EP,US);
H04B7/2656 (EP,US);
H04L12/40058 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/47] | H04L7/04, H04B7/26, H04L12/28, H04L7/08, H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ADAPTIVE NETZWERKTECHNIK UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ISOCHRONEN ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2008/47] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ADAPTIVE NETWORK TECHNIQUE USING ISOCHRONOUS TRANSMISSION | [2008/47] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE TECHNIQUE DE RÉSEAU ADAPTATIF UTILISANT UNE TRANSMISSION ISOCHRONE | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 20.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2007 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | LU | 05.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.03.2007 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1622313 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12,17-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraphs [0145] - [0160] * * figures 20,21 * * claim - * [A] 13-16; | [A]WO0161883 (PINPOINT CORP [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004032350 (KNAPP DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US4771426 (RATTLINGOURD GLEN D [US], et al); | [A]US2005276255 (AIELLO ROBERTO [US], et al); | [A]US2003086442 (REYNOLDS JOHN C [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1622313 |