EP2109928 - REACTIVE POWER CONTROL FOR OPERATING A WIND FARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingeteam Power Technology, S.A. Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia Edificio 106, 2a planta 48170 Zamudio (Bizkaia) / ES | [2012/42] |
Former [2009/43] | For all designated states Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVAS, Gregorio c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | 02 /
GARMENDIA, Iker c/o Ingeteam Technology, S.A Parque Tecnologico de Bizkaia Edificio 108 48170 Zamudio, Bizkaia / ES | 03 /
ELORRIAGA, Josu c/o Ingeteam Technology, S.A. Parque Tecnologico de Bizkaia Edificio 108 48170 Zamudio, Bizkaia / ES | 04 /
MAYOR, Jesus c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | 05 /
BARBACHANO, Javier Perez c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | 06 /
SOLE, David c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | 07 /
ACEDO, Jorge c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
RIVAS, Gregorio c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | ||
02 /
GARMENDIA, Iker c/o Ingeteam Technology, S.A Parque Tecnologico de Bizkaia. Edificio 108 48170 Zamudio, Bizkaia / ES | |||
03 /
ELORRIAGA, Josu c/o Ingeteam Technology, S.A. Parque Tecnologico de Bizkaia Edificio 108 48170 Zamudio, Bizkaia / ES | |||
04 /
MAYOR, Jesus c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
05 /
BARBACHANO, Javier Perez c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
06 /
SOLE, David c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
07 /
ACEDO, Jorge c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
Former [2009/43] | 01 /
RIVAS, Gregorio c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | ||
02 /
GARMENDIA, Iker c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
03 /
ELORRIAGA, Josu c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
04 /
MAYOR, Jesus c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
05 /
BARBACHANO, Javier Perez c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
06 /
SOLE, David c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | |||
07 /
ACEDO, Jorge c/o Ingeteam Energy, S.A. Avd. Ciudad de la Innovacion, 13 31621 Sarriguren, Navarra / ES | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07825299.6 | 24.04.2007 | [2009/43] | WO2007IB02983 | Priority number, date | US20060615241 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615241 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008084285 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2109928 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/18, H02J3/38 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
H02J3/1885 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/50 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP,US);
Y02E40/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Extension states | AL | 10.07.2009 | BA | 10.07.2009 | HR | 10.07.2009 | MK | 10.07.2009 | RS | 10.07.2009 | Title | German: | REAKTIVE LEISTUNGSREGELUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER WINDFARM | [2009/43] | English: | REACTIVE POWER CONTROL FOR OPERATING A WIND FARM | [2009/43] | French: | REGULATION ELECTRIQUE REACTIVE POUR EXPLOITATION D'UN PARC EOLIEN | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | EP10172973.9 / EP2254217 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6492801 (SIMS THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 3,7 * abstract * * figures 3-6 * * column 3, line 47 - column 6, line 26 ** column 7, line 1 - line 36 *; | [Y]EP1508951 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 26 - page 6, paragraph 40 * * claims 1,6,10 * * figures 4,6,7 *; | [Y]WO2005031160 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * * page 11, line 19 - page 16, line 26 *; | [Y]EP1643609 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 6, paragraph 22 - column 8, paragraph 25 * * column 9, paragraph 29 - paragraph 31 * * claim 1 *; | [XA]DE102004048341 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1,12 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 3, column 2, paragraph 17 * * page 4, column 2, paragraph 29 - page 6, column 1, paragraph 38 * * the whole document * [A] 2,6; | [A]WO2006120033 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 11, line 19 - page 17, line 23 *; | [Y] - CELLI G ET AL, "Optimal Participation of a Microgrid to the Energy Market with an Intelligent EMS", POWER ENGINEERING CONFERENCE, 2005. IPEC 2005. THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL SINGAPORE 29-02 NOV. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051129), ISBN 978-981-05-5702-7, pages 1 - 6, XP010914083 [Y] 8 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, paragraph III - page 3, column 1, paragraph IV * * tables III,IV * * figure 2 * | [A] - MILLER N W ET AL, "Dynamic modeling of GE 1.5 and 3.6 MW wind turbine generators for stability simulations", 2003 IEEE POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY GENERAL MEETING. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TORONTO, ONTARIO, CANADA, JULY 13 - 17, 2003, IEEE POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030713), VOL. 4 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-7989-6, pages 1977 - 1983, XP010683633 [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 4-1,4-2 * * page 1979, column 1, paragraph 4.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PES.2003.1267470 | [A] - JOSÉ LUIS RODRÍGUEZ-AMENEDORODRIGUEZ-AMENEDO ET AL, "Automatic Generation Control of a Wind Farm With Variable Speed Wind Turbines", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ENERGY CONVERSION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200206), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0885-8969, XP011072090 [A] 1,2,5,6 * figures 3,5 * * abstract * * page 280, paragraph IV - page 281, paragraph V * | by applicant | US2005046196 | US6965174 | DE102004048341 |