EP2087626 - ADDITIONAL MODULATION INFORMATION SIGNALING FOR HIGH SPEED DOWNLINK PACKET ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANTA-AHO, Karri Hakkukuja 1 C 40 02650 Espoo / FI | 02 /
KAIKKONEN, Jorma Tiedonkaari 5 B 10 90570 Oulu / FI | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Smith, Gary John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/33] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria Nokia Corporation IPR Department Keilalahdentie 4 01250 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 07825547.8 | 30.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007IB03289 | Priority number, date | US20060855335P | 30.10.2006 Original published format: US 855335 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008053323 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2087626 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087626 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0079 (EP,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSÄTZLICHE MODULATIONSINFORMATIONSSIGNALISIERUNG FÜR SCHNELLEN ABWÄRTSSTRECKEN-PAKETZUGANG | [2009/33] | English: | ADDITIONAL MODULATION INFORMATION SIGNALING FOR HIGH SPEED DOWNLINK PACKET ACCESS | [2009/33] | French: | SIGNALISATION D'INFORMATIONS DE MODULATION SUPPLÉMENTAIRE POUR UN ACCÈS PAR PAQUETS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE HAUTE VITESSE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | 02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | 03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | 04
16.10.2019
18.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | 05
01.10.2021
01.10.2021
INTERVENTION Oppo Mobile UK Ltd. 258 Bath Road Slough, England SL1 4DX / GB Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 06
19.10.2021
19.10.2021
INTERVENTION OROPE Germany GmbH Graf-Adolf-Platz 15 40213 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 07
06.07.2022
07.07.2022
INTERVENTION Vivo Tech GmbH Speditionsstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | 08
25.07.2022
25.07.2022
INTERVENTION Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. Vivo Road 1, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong / CN Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | |||
04
16.10.2019
18.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
05
01.10.2021
01.10.2021
INTERVENTION Oppo Mobile UK Ltd. 258 Bath Road Slough, England SL1 4DX / GB Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
19.10.2021
19.10.2021
INTERVENTION OROPE Germany GmbH Graf-Adolf-Platz 15 40213 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07
06.07.2022
07.07.2022
INTERVENTION Vivo Tech GmbH Speditionsstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | |||
04
16.10.2019
18.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
05
01.10.2021
01.10.2021
INTERVENTION Oppo Mobile UK Ltd. 258 Bath Road Slough, England SL1 4DX / GB Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
19.10.2021
19.10.2021
INTERVENTION OROPE Germany GmbH Graf-Adolf-Platz 15 40213 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2021/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | |||
04
16.10.2019
18.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
05
01.10.2021
01.10.2021
INTERVENTION Oppo Mobile UK Ltd. 258 Bath Road Slough, England SL1 4DX / GB Opponent's representative Fähndrich, Martin Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2021/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | |||
04
16.10.2019
18.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | |||
04
16.10.2019
18.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
03
16.10.2019
17.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | |||
04
16.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
20.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
02
16.08.2019
21.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Grosch, Marcus Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP Mollstrasse 42 68165 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2019/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.08.2019
15.08.2019
ADMISSIBLE TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL Opponent's representative Haupt, Christian Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | 30.10.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.03.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.07.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/12] | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 11.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T0522/21 | 11.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.07.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 10.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T0522/21 | 10.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.07.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 07.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T0522/21 | 07.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.07.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T0522/21 | 10.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 05.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 05.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Petition(s) for review: | 30.11.2023 | Petition for review received | Number: R0018/23 | for appeal No. T0522/21-3505 | Petitioner: APPR | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2004028020 (FREDERIKSEN FRANK [DK], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8,12-20 * page 2, paragraph 20; figures 1-5 * [A] 3-6,9-11; | [DYA] - ERICSSON, "Higher Order Modulation for HSPA - Impact on RAN1 specifications, R1-062935", TSG-RAN WG1 MEETING #46BIS, Seoul, Korea, (20061009), XP002473742 [DY] 1,2,7,8,12-20 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * [A] 3-6,9-11 | [XP] - PHILIPS, QUALCOMM, MOTOROLA, ERICSSON, NOKIA, RENESAS, "Change request 25.212 CR 0245: Introduction of 64QAM for HSDPA", *GPP TSG-RAN WG1 MEETING #48, St. Louis, USA, (20070213), XP002473743 [XP] 1-20 * page 9, paragraph 4.6.2.3 * | by applicant | US2004028020 | Opposition | US2004028020 | US2003123470 | - Anonymous, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Physical channels and mapping of transport channels onto physical channels (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.211 version 4.6.0 Release 4)", ETSI TS 125 211, (20020900), no. V4.6.0, pages 1 - 47, XP055652803 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Continuous Connectivity for Packet Data Users; (Release 7)", 3GPP Standard; 3GPP TR 25.903,, (20060923), no. V1.1.0, pages 1 - 125, XP050380336 | - Harri Holma, Antti Toskala, WCDMA for UMTS Radio Access For Third Generation Mobile Communications, Third Edition, England, John Wiley & Sons, Ltd.,, (2004), pages 114-127, 338 - 344, XP055652813 | - QUALCOMM Europe, "HS-SCCH in support of D-TxAA", 3GPP Draft; R1-062032,, (20060823), XP050102581 | - Qualcomm Europe, "Open issues on details in support of MIMO (FDD) for Rel-7", 3GPP Draft; R1-062440,, (20060902), XP050102951 | - Ericsson, "Associated downlink signaling", 3GPP Draft; R1-01-1049, page 20020128, XP050111072 | - Samsung Electronics, "DL signalling for HSDPA", 3GPP Draft; R1-01-0874, page 20010828, XP050095151 | - Ericsson and Vodafone, "Modulation capability for HSDPA", 3GPP Draft; R1-01-1116, page 20011125, XP050095351 | - Anonymous, "Scope of future HSPA Evolution", 3GPP RAN Plenary #31` RP-060136, (20060302), pages 1 - 3, XP055652832 | - "Cingular Views on the "RAN Radio" Specific Aspects on HSPA Evolution", 3GPP Draft; R1-062001,, (20060821), vol. RAN WG1, XP050102554 | - MCC, "Approved Report of 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #45 meeting in Shanghai (Shanghai, China, 08 - 12 May, 2006)", 3GPP Draft; R1-062448, (20060904), vol. RAN WG1, XP050448860 | - Motorola, "Scope of future FDD HSPA Evolution", 3GPP Draft; R1-061462_HSPA_Scope,, (20060502), XP050596090 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 7.5.0 Release 7)", (20070500), pages 1 - 105, XP055634004 | - "Multiplexing and Channel Coding (FDD", ETSI TS 125 212, (20050600), XP055634042 | - MOTOROLA, "WCDMA MIMO Downlink Signaling", TSGR1#46bis(06)2909, Se- oul, South Korea, (20061009), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsgran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_46bis/Docs/R1-062909.zip, XP055640329 | - ERICSSON, "R1-062935 ''Higher Order Modulation for HSPA Impact on RANI specifications", TSG RAN WG1 #46thbis, Seoul, Korea, (20061004), URL: https://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg ran/WG1_ RL1/TSGR1_ 46bis/Docs/R1-062935.zip, XP050103417 | - MOTOROLA, "WCDMA MIMO Downlink Signaling", R1-062909, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #46bis, Seoul, South Korea, (20061009), XP050103391 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommu- nications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 7.2.0 Release 7", ETSI TS 125 212, (20060930), XP055633972 | - PHILIPS et al., "Change request 25.212 CR 0245: Introduction of 64QAM for HSDPA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #48, St. Louis, USA, (20070212), XP002473743 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommu- nications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 7.5.0 Release 7", ETSI TS 125 212 v7.5.0, (20070531), XP055634004 | - ERICSSON, "Higher Order Modulation for HSPA - Impact on RAN1 specifications", R1-062935, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #46bis, Seoul, South Korea, (20061009), XP002473742 | - GERHARD WUNDER et al., "Concept of an OFDMA HSDPA Air Inter- face for UMTS Downlink", 14th IST Mobile & Wireless Communica- tion Summit, Dresden, Germany, (20050619), XP055634010 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommu- nications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 5.0.0 Release 5", ETSI TS 125 212 V5.0.0, (20020331), XP055634017 | - "Universal Mobile Telecom- munications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 5.10.0 Release 5", ETSI TS 125 212 V5.10.0, (20020630), XP055634042 | - PHILIPS, "Details of HS-SCCH signaling for Rel-7 MIMO", R1-062485, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #46bis, Seoul, South Korea, (20061009), XP050103009 | - MOTOROLA, "WCDMA MIMO Downlink Signaling", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #46bis, R1-062909, Seoul, Südkorea, (20061009), XP050103391 | - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 7.2.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 125 212", Technical Specification,, (20060930), vol. 3-R1, no. V7.2.0, XP014035549 | - PHILIPS et al., "Introduction of 64QAM for HSDPA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #48, R1- 071160, St. Louis, USA, (20070212), XP050105140 | - Anonymous, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 7.5.0 Release 7)", ETSI TS 125 212 v7.5.0,, (20070531), pages 1 - 105, XP055634004 | - ERICSSON, "Higher Order Modulation for HSPA - Impact on RAN1 specifications", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #46bis, R1-062935,, Seoul, Südkorea, (20061009), XP050103417 | - GERHARD WUNDER et al., "Concept of an OFDMA HSDPA Air Inter- face for UMTS Downlink", 14th IST Mobile & Wireless Communication Summit, Dresden, Deutschland, (20050619), XP055634010 | - Anonymous, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 5.0.0 Release 5)", ETSI TS 125 212 V5.0.0,, (20020331), XP055634017 | - Anonymous, "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.212 version 5.10.0 Release 5)", ETSI TS 125 212 V5.10.0,, (20050630), XP055634042 | - PHILIPS, "Details of HS-SCCH signaling for Rel-7 MIMO", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #46bis, R1-062485, Seoul, Südko- rea, (20061009), XP050103009 |