EP2094674 - A SALT OF 3-BENZYL-2-METHYL-2,3,3A,4,5,6,7,7A-OCTAHYDROBENZO[D]ISOXAZOL-4-ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abiogen Pharma S.p.A. Via Meucci 36 56014 Località Ospedaletto (PI) / IT | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEGGIANI, Fabio Via Randaccio, 12 56123 Pisa / IT | 02 /
DINI, Laura Via Medaglie d'Oro, 28 56127 Pisa / IT | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Cattaneo, Elisabetta, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07825549.4 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007IB03291 | Priority number, date | IT2006MI02102 | 02.11.2006 Original published format: IT MI20062102 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053325 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094674 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094674 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D261/20, A61K31/423, A61P25/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
C07D261/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/423 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | SALZ VON 3-BENZYL-2-METHYL-2,3,3A,4,5,6,7,7A-OCTAHYDROBENZO[D]ISOXAZOL-4-ON | [2009/36] | English: | A SALT OF 3-BENZYL-2-METHYL-2,3,3A,4,5,6,7,7A-OCTAHYDROBENZO[D]ISOXAZOL-4-ONE | [2009/36] | French: | SEL DE 3-BENZYL-2-METHYL-2,3,3A,4,5,6,7,7A-OCTAHYDROBENZO[D]ISOXAZOL-4-ONE | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 23.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | MT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | GB | 31.10.2011 | IE | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | LU | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
LU | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
LU | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 31.10.2011 | ||
IE | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9317004 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [DA] 1-34* Claims 1-23; Formula (I); examples 1(A), 1(B), 2, 5, 7; p. 5, l. 12-20 * |