EP2092538 - MULTICONNECTION COIL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Politecnico di Milano Piazza Leonardo da Vinci 32 20133 Milano / IT | For all designated states Tecnomagnete S.p.A. Via Nerviano, 31 20020 Lainate / IT | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARDONE, Michele Via Mantegna, 29 20090 Trezzano S/N (MI) / IT | 02 /
COSMAI, Giovanni Via A. Volta 10 20027 Rescaldina (MI) / IT | 03 /
FARANDA, Roberto Largo Zanuso 4 20149 Milano / IT | 04 /
GIGLIO, Antonino Via Oratoio, 42 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [2009/48] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
CARDONE, Michele Via Mantegna, 29 20090 Trezzano S/N (MI) / IT | ||
02 /
COSMAI, Giovanni Via A. Volta 10 20027 Rescaldina (MI) / IT | |||
03 /
FARANDA, Roberto Via Francesco Cilea 98 20151 Milano / IT | |||
04 /
GIGLIO, Antonino Via Oratoio, 42 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Representative(s) | Ciceri, Fabio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Ciceri, Fabio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/35] | Bonvicini, Davide Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07825566.8 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007IB03314 | Priority number, date | IT2006MI02202 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: IT MI20062202 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059332 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092538 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01F5/02, H01F5/04, B23Q3/154 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H01F5/04 (EP);
B23Q3/1546 (EP);
H01F5/02 (EP);
H01F27/29 (EP);
H01F7/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | MEHRVERBINDUNGS-SPULENSTRUKTUR | [2009/35] | English: | MULTICONNECTION COIL STRUCTURE | [2009/35] | French: | STRUCTURE DE BOBINE MULTICONNEXION | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 31.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 30.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2012 | 31.10.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4423399 (GOODRICH RONALD W [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 3, lines 51-55 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 51 * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]GB1052916 (WILLIAM ALTON RAY) [X] 1-14 * page 1, lines 15-31 * * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 42 * * page 2, line 128 - page 3, line 14 * * figures 1,6,7 *; | [X]GB228281 (JOHN HENDERSON) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 103-114 * * page 3, lines 80-88 * * figure 4 *; | [X]WO8300581 (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-14 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 5; figures 2-6 * * page 9, columns 11-30; figure 9 *; | [X]US5517167 (YAMAMOTO KYOICHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-14 * column 1, lines 14-40 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, lines 44-61 * * figures 12,14 *; | [A]EP0345554 (TECNOMAGNETE SPA [IT]) [A] 14 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2007059992 (KIM JUN-HO [KR]) [PX] 1-14 * paragraphs [0037] , [0048] - [0050] - [0055] , [0056]; figures 2,5 * |