EP2036092 - METHOD OF NAVIGATING ITEMS AT A MEDIA PLAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERHEYDEN, Karl, F., M. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/43] |
Former [2009/12] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07825832.4 | 21.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007IB52407 | Priority number, date | EP20060115975 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: EP 06115975 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008007269 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2036092 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036092 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2036092 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/34 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | G11B27/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NAVIGATION VON ELEMENTEN IN EINEM MEDIA-PLAYER | [2009/12] | English: | METHOD OF NAVIGATING ITEMS AT A MEDIA PLAYER | [2009/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE NAVIGATION A TRAVERS DES ELEMENTS AU NIVEAU D'UN LECTEUR MULTIMEDIA | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2019
ADMISSIBLE Molnia, David Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2019/35] | 07.08.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.09.2020 | 09.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.09.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.11.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.04.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2007 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | IE | 21.06.2019 | LU | 21.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 21.06.2007 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 21.06.2019 | ||
LU | 21.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 21.06.2019 | ||
LU | 21.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 21.06.2019 | ||
LU | 21.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004123725 (KIM DUIL [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0064] - [0066]; figure 6 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP1548741 (BOSE CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0188]; figures 26-31 *; | [A]EP1489765 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0060] - [0065]; figure 10 * | [Y] - PAMPALK E ET AL, "Dynamic Playlist generation based on skipping behaviour", PROCEEDINGS ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MUSIC INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, XX, XX, (20050915), pages 1 - 4, XP002424957 [Y] 1-14 * page 1 * | [A] - ANDREJA ANDRIC ET AL, "Automatic playlist generation based on tracking user's listening habits", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20060519), vol. 29, no. 2, ISSN 1573-7721, pages 127 - 151, XP019404136 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-006-0003-9 | by applicant | US7000188 | US2004123725 | EP1548741 | EP1489765 | - E.PAMPALK ET AL., "Dynamic Playlist generation based on skipping behaviour", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL SYNMPOSIUM ON MUSIC INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, (20050915), pages 1 - 4, XP002424957 | Opposition | US2002078056 | US2004123725 | EP1489765 | EP1548741 | US2005273515 |