EP2051777 - ULTRASOUND SYSTEM FOR CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW IMAGING AND MICROBUBBLE-ENHANCED BLOOD CLOT LYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/03] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWNING, Edward, J. P.O. Box 3003 Bothell, Washington 98041-3003 / US | 02 /
SHI, William P.O. Box 3003 Bothell, Washington 98041-3003 / US | 03 /
POWERS, Jeffry, E. P.O. Box 3003 Bothell, Washington 98041-3003 / US | 04 /
AVERKIOU, Michalakis P.O. Box 3003 Bothell, Washington 98041-3003 / US | 05 /
GAUTHIER, Thomas P.O. Box 3003 Bothell, Washington 98041-3003 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/03] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/18] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07825989.2 | 03.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007IB53073 | Priority number, date | US20060822106P | 11.08.2006 Original published format: US 822106 P | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008017997 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2051777 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2051777 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00, A61B8/06, A61B8/00, A61B5/026, A61B17/22, A61B8/08 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B8/0816 (US);
A61B17/22004 (US);
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US);
A61B8/0808 (EP,US);
A61B8/085 (US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/4227 (EP,US);
A61B8/481 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22014 (US);
A61B2090/502 (US);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0021 (US);
A61N2007/0039 (US);
A61N2007/0078 (US);
A61N2007/0082 (US);
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | A61N7/00, A61B8/06, A61B8/00, A61B5/026, A61B17/22, A61B8/08, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/03] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLSYSTEM ZUR STRÖMUNGSABBILDUNG VON HIRNBLUT UND MIKROBLÄSCHEN-BLUTGERINNUNGSLYSE | [2009/18] | English: | ULTRASOUND SYSTEM FOR CEREBRAL BLOOD FLOW IMAGING AND MICROBUBBLE-ENHANCED BLOOD CLOT LYSIS | [2009/18] | French: | SYSTÈME À ULTRASONS POUR L'IMAGERIE DE LA CIRCULATION SANGUINE CÉRÉBRALE ET LA LYSE DE CAILLOT SANGUIN AU MOYEN DE MICROBULLES | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 15.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2007 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | ES | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | IE | 03.08.2019 | LU | 03.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 03.08.2007 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 03.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004049134 (TOSAYA CAROL A [US], et al) [Y] 4,12,13 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2005015009 (MOURAD PIERRE D [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0075] ** figure 8 *; | [XY]EP1591073 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0018] - [0023] * * figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 4,11-13 | Examination | - "Ultraschallanwendung am Menschen - Empfehlung der Strahlenschutzkommission", (20120419), URL: http://www.ssk.de/SharedDocs/Beratungsergebnisse_PDF/2012/Ultraschall.pdf?__blob=publicationFile, (20131121), XP055089522 | - "The Safe Use of Ultrasound in Medical Diagnosis", ISBN 978-0-90-574979-2, (20120101), URL: http://www.birjournals.org/site/books/Safe_Use_of_Ultrasound.pdf, (20131121), XP055089603 |