EP2070283 - PAPR reduction using generalized constellation rotation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/25] | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO REDUCE PAPR IN SINGLE CARRIER AND SCBT COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | ||
[2016/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/32] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYEDI-ESFAHANI, Seyed-Alireza P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor NY 10510-8001 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
SEYEDI-ESFAHANI, Seyed-Alireza P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor NY 10510-8001 / US | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/32] |
Former [2009/25] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07826498.3 | 21.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007IB53846 | Priority number, date | US20060826952P | 26.09.2006 Original published format: US 826952 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008038210 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2070283 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070283 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/34, H04L27/20 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H04L27/3483 (EP,US);
H04L27/2082 (EP,US);
H04L27/3411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PAPR-Reduzierung unter Verwendung einer verallgemeinerten Rotation der Symbolkonstellation | [2016/10] | English: | PAPR reduction using generalized constellation rotation | [2016/10] | French: | Réduction de PAPR en utilisant une généralisation de rotation de constellation des symboles | [2016/10] |
Former [2009/25] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR PAPR-REDUZIERUNG IN EINZELTRÄGER- UND SCBT-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | ||
Former [2009/25] | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO REDUCE PAPR IN SINGLE CARRIER AND SCBT COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS | ||
Former [2009/25] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE LE PAPR DANS UNE PORTEUSE UNIQUE, ET SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATIONS SCBT | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 09.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2007 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | IE | 21.09.2016 | LU | 21.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.09.2007 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1128623 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0054] * * figures 2a-c *; | [X]US2006034390 (VUMMINTALA SHASHIDHAR [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] , [0055] , [0059] * * paragraphs [0064] , [0069] , [0075] , [0076] * * figures 5a,5b * | [X] - DIVSALAR D ET AL, "COMBINED TRELLIS CODING WITH ASYMMETRIC MODULATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION (GLOBECOM), NY, US, (19851202), vol. 2, pages 646 - 652, XP000794847 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * Section I (Introduction) * * Section II (System Model) * * figures 1-4,8 * | [X] - PURSLEY M B ET AL, "Phase-shift-key modulation for multimedia multicast transmission in mobile wireless networks", IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, CONFERENCE PROCE EDINGS, NY, USA, (19961021), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-3682-7, pages 210 - 214, XP010203983 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * Sections I-III * * figures 1,3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1996.568615 | Examination | - KUBO H ET AL, "NARROW-BAND PHASE-ROTATING PHASE-SHIFT KEYING", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (19990401), vol. E82-B, no. 4, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 627 - 635, XP000940222 |