EP2066661 - PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited Plot No. 90, Sector- 32 Gurgaon, Haryana 122001 / IN | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALACHANDRAN, Sarala D-1302, Lakshachandi Apts. Gokhuldham, Goregaon (E) Mumbai 400063 / IN | 02 /
GUPTA, Nidhi J-160, Vikas Puri New Delhi, Delhi 110018 / IN | 03 /
KHAIRNAR, Vinayak, Vasantrao c/o Vasnatrao S. Khairnar Plot No-31, Hanumannagar at-Girananagar Post-Tal-Nandgaon Maharashtra 423106 / IN | 04 /
RUDRA, Sonali 721, Second Floor, Sector 17A Gurgaon, Haryana 122001 / IN | 05 /
PALLE, Venkata, P. G901, Sylvan Heights, Sanewadi Aundh, Pune Maharashtra 411007 / IN | 06 /
DASTIDAR, Sunanda, G. B-138, Sarita Vihar New Delhi, Delhi 110044 / IN | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2009/24] | Application number, filing date | 07826507.1 | 22.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007IB53855 | Priority number, date | INDE20992006 | 22.09.2006 Original published format: IN DE20992006 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008035316 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066661 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/04 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
C07D261/18 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D413/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | PHOSPHODIESTERASEINHIBITOREN | [2009/24] | English: | PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS | [2009/24] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE PHOSPHODIESTERASE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5686434 (KLEINMAN EDWARD FOX [US]) [A] 1,2* column 34; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2005051931 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 1, lines 4-12 * * page 43; examples 8,9; compounds 4, 5 * * pages 49-51; example 16; compounds 91-93 * * page 69; claim 4 * * page 63; claim 1 * * page 71; claims 8-12 * |