EP2074552 - TEMPLATE SYNTHESIS FOR ECG/PPG BASED BIOMETRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA MOLINA, Gary, N. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BRUEKERS, Alphons, A., M., L. c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PRESURA, Cristian c/o High Tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
DAMSTRA, Marijn, C. c/o High tech Campus 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07826525.3 | 25.09.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007IB53880 | Priority number, date | EP20060121504 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06121504 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008038220 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074552 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
G06F18/28 (EP,US);
G06F2218/16 (EP,US);
G06V40/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON VORLAGEN FÜR EKG/PPG-BASIERTE BIOMETRIE | [2009/27] | English: | TEMPLATE SYNTHESIS FOR ECG/PPG BASED BIOMETRICS | [2009/27] | French: | SYNTHESE DE MODELE POUR ECG/PPG SUR LA BASE DE LA BIOMETRIE | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 12.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1071034 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US2005281439 (LANGE DANIEL H [IL]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006215883 (KIM KYUNG-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0084]; figures 3a,3b,4-6 *; | [X] - WIRTZ B ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Average prototypes for stroke-based signature verification", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION. (ICDAR). ULM, GERMANY, AUG. 18 - 20, 1997, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ICDAR, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (19970818), VOL. II, ISBN 0-8186-7898-4, pages 268 - 272, XP010244723 [X] 1-5,7,9-13 * Section 2.2. "Description of the approach", Fig. 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.1997.619854 | [A] - VULLINGS H J L M ET AL, "Automated ECG segmentation with dynamic time warping", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 20TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE HONG KONG, CHINA 29 OCT.-1 NOV. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19981029), ISBN 0-7803-5164-9, pages 163 - 166, XP010320109 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.1998.745863 | [A] - SHEN T W ET AL, "One-lead ECG for identity verification", SECOND JOINT EMBS-BMES CONFERENCE 2002. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. 24TH. ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY. ANNUAL FALL MEETING OF THE BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERINGSOCIETY. HOUSTON, TX, OCT. 23 - 26, 2002, ANNUA, (20021023), VOL. 1 OF 3. CONF. 24, ISBN 0-7803-7612-9, pages 62 - 63, XP010621210 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2002.1134388 |