EP2089820 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A SUMMARY OF A VIDEO DATA STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINNEY, Martin F. High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
EHLERS, Enno L. High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BARBIERI, Mauro High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
FONSECA, Pedro High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/34] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07827039.4 | 09.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007IB54558 | Priority number, date | EP20060123981 | 14.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06123981 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059416 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089820 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089820 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G11B27/031 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06F16/7844 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (KR);
H04N5/93 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENFASSUNG EINES VIDEODATENSTROMS | [2009/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GENERATING A SUMMARY OF A VIDEO DATA STREAM | [2009/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR GÉNÉRER UN RÉSUMÉ D'UN FLUX DE DONNÉES VIDÉO | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2007 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | IE | 09.11.2013 | LU | 09.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.11.2007 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 09.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 09.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 09.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002126143 (BAE SO YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049]; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2002126203 (YU JAE SHIN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0066]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2006075454 (JUNG CHEOLKON [KR], et al) [A] 1,6-8* paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * | by applicant | US2002126143 |