EP2104462 - NON-INVASIVE ULTRASOUND-GUIDED BODY CONTOURING USING SKIN CONTACT COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perl, Paul K. 9A Shenkin St. 53291 Givatiyim / IL | For all designated states Munoz, Francisco Arriaza Sarda 10 103A Sabadell E-08203 Barcelon / ES | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Pawlowski, Adam, et al Eupatent.PL Al. Kosciuszki 23/25 90-418 Lodz / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Pawlowski, Adam, et al Eupatent.PL ul. Rentowna 20/26 93-310 Lodz / PL | Application number, filing date | 07827423.0 | 25.11.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007IL01450 | Priority number, date | ES20070064835U | 16.02.2007 Original published format: ES 200764835 U | ES20070064836U | 16.02.2007 Original published format: ES 200764836 U | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008099376 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104462 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
A61H23/0245 (EP,US);
A61B18/04 (KR);
A61B8/546 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00106 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0214 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0242 (EP,US);
A61H2201/025 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0285 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/40] | A61B18/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE ULTRASCHALLGESTÜTZTE KÖRPERKONTURIERUNG MIT HAUTKONTAKTKÜHLUNG | [2009/40] | English: | NON-INVASIVE ULTRASOUND-GUIDED BODY CONTOURING USING SKIN CONTACT COOLING | [2009/40] | French: | DÉFINITION NON INVASIVE DES CONTOURS DU CORPS GUIDÉE PAR ULTRASONS UTILISANT UN REFROIDISSEMENT PAR CONTACT AVEC LA PEAU | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 31.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0204074 (ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHEST [RU], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * * page 12, line 20 - page 15, line 21 * [Y] 12; | [X]WO0215768 (TIMI 3 SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,13-15 * abstract * * page 23, line 16 - page 29, line 35 *; | [XY]US2003055363 (HORZEWSKI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0096] * [Y] 12; | [XY]WO2004080147 (TORBATI ELDAD [IL]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * page 10, line 13 - page 12, line 7 * * page 14, line 15 - page 22, line 10 * [Y] 12; | [X]WO2006110772 (GRUBER WILLIAM H [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract ** page 6, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 3 *; | [XY]US2007038094 (KRUGLIKOV ILJA [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0052] * [Y] 12 | International search | [X]US2004206365 (KNOWLTON EDWARD WELLS [US]); | [A]US2005267454 (HISSONG JAMES B [US], et al) |