EP2046792 - Process for the preparation of tenofovir [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/16] | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TENOFOVIR | ||
[2014/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED Plot No. 564/A/22, Road No. 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2015/09] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED Plot No. 564/A/22, Road No. 92 Jubilee Hills Hyderabad 500033 Andhra Pradesh / IN | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Matrix Laboratories Limited 1-1-151/1, IV Floor, Sairam Towers, Alexander Road Secunderabad, 500 003 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASIREDDY, Uma, Maheswer, Rao Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | 02 /
VELLANKI, Siva, Rama, Prasad Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | 03 /
BALUSU, Raja, Babu Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | 04 /
BANDI, Naga, Durga, Rao Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | 05 /
JUJJAVARAPU, Pravan, Kumar Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | 06 /
GINJUPALLI, Sambasiva, Rao Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | 07 /
PILLI, Rama, Krishna Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | [2015/09] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
VASIREDDY, Uma, Maheswer, Rao Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | ||
02 /
VELLANKI, Siva, Rama, Prasad Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | |||
03 /
BALUSU, Raja, Babu Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | |||
04 /
BANDI, Naga, Durga, Rao Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | |||
05 /
JUJJAVARAPU, Pravan, Kumar Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | |||
06 /
GINJUPALLI, Sambasiva, Rao Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | |||
07 /
PILLI, Rama, Krishna Plot No. 34A Anrich Industrial Estate Bollaram, Jinnaram Mandal Medak Dist Hyderabad 500055, Andharapradesh / IN | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [2015/09] |
Former [2009/16] | Wittkopp, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07827516.1 | 11.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007IN00286 | Priority number, date | IN2006CHE1218 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: IN CH12182006 | IN2006CHE1352 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: IN CH13522006 | IN2007CHE0484 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: IN CH04842007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008007392 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2046792 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046792 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/34, C07F9/6561 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
C07D473/34 (EP,US);
C07F9/65616 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Tenofovir | [2014/38] | English: | Process for the preparation of tenofovir | [2014/38] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de ténofovir | [2014/38] |
Former [2009/16] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TENOFOVIR | ||
Former [2009/16] | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TENOFOVIR | ||
Former [2009/16] | PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ DESTINÉ À PRÉPARER DU TÉNOFOVIR | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Observations by third parties | 08.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2007 | AT | 25.02.2015 | BE | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | IE | 11.07.2015 | LU | 11.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 11.07.2007 | |
AT | 25.02.2015 | ||
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 11.07.2015 | ||
LU | 11.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 11.07.2015 | ||
LU | 11.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 11.07.2015 | ||
LU | 11.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
BE | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 11.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 11.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 11.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9905150 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8* examples 1-3,5,10,11 *; | [DY]US5922695 (ARIMILLI MURTY N [US], et al) [DY] 1-8 * columns 39-40 * * column 42, line 24 - column 45, line 66 * | Examination | US5935946 | WO2008143500 | by applicant | US5733788 | WO9905150 | US5922695 | US6465649 | US2004018150 | other | WO2008143500 |