EP2056087 - PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Mitsuru c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
MAKINAGA, Hitoshi c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
IMAI, Junji c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 05 /
MASAKI, Yasufumi c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 06 /
IKEGAWA, Naoto c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 07 /
NAKAHARA, Youichiro c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07828583.0 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP68837 | Priority number, date | JP20060270758 | 02.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006270758 | JP20060274178 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006274178 | JP20060310792 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006310792 | JP20060346538 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006346538 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008041607 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056087 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00, G01L9/06, G01L9/08, G01L9/12, H01L29/84 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G01L9/0075 (EP,US);
G01L9/00 (KR);
G01L19/14 (KR);
H01L29/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/19] | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR | [2009/19] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR | [2009/19] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2009 | Translation filed | 18.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 27.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5437189 (BROWN CLEM H [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 34 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]EP0676628 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 20 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,3,10,11,13-15; | [A]DE19902450 (FESTO AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 1, line 64 - column 5, line 56 ** figures 1-3 *; | [XI]EP1376090 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 1-9,12; | [XI]DE202005017627U (AKTIV SENSOR GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 13,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 1,3,9,12,17 | International search | [X]JP2000199725 (HOKURIKU ELECT IND); | [X]JPH11326088 (HOKURIKU ELECT IND); | [Y]JP2001311675 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JP2003130749 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH10104101 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2000091663 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD); | [A]JPH1126832 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [A]JPS6180024 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH0495741 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPH09184779 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPH0196523 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPH06323941 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) | Examination | DE4142101 | DE202005011253U | by applicant | US5437189 | EP0676628 | DE202005017627U | EP1376090 |