EP2070120 - SOLID-STATE IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | For all designated states Fujifilm Photonix Co., Ltd. 1-6 Matsusakadaira Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 9813492 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujifilm Photonix Co., Ltd. 1-6 Matsusakadaira Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 9813492 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASAKI, Kosuke FUJIFILM Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 2500193 / JP | 02 /
IESAKA, Mamoru 5-3, Morinosato 4-chome Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0122 / JP | 03 /
WAKO, Hideki Oyama 204-6-B102, Aza Higashimiyuki-cho Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-0843 / JP | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
TAKASAKI, Kosuke FUJIFILM Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 2500193 / JP | ||
02 /
IESAKA, Mamoru FUJIFILM Photonix Co., Ltd. 1-6 Matsusakadaira Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 9813492 / JP | |||
03 /
WAKO, Hideki FUJIFILM Photonix Co., Ltd. 1-6 Matsusakadaira Taiwa-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 9813492 / JP | Representative(s) | Höhfeld, Jochen Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [2009/25] | Application number, filing date | 07829138.2 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007JP69399 | Priority number, date | JP20060265497 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006265497 | JP20060265498 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006265498 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044580 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070120 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/14, H01L23/02 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H01L27/14618 (EP,US);
H01L23/60 (EP,US);
H01L27/14632 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/47] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPER-BILDSENSOR | [2009/25] | English: | SOLID-STATE IMAGE SENSOR | [2009/25] | French: | CAPTEUR D'IMAGE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 29.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP12198378.7 / EP2573814 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1387397 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3-5 * paragraphs [0298] - [0312] * * figures 23a, 23b * [I] 6-10; | [E]EP1861879 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 3-10 * page 26, line 16 - page 27, line 21 * * page 49, lines 3-10 * * page 51, lines 3-4 * * figures 6a-d *; | [E]EP1961045 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 3-7 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 7 * * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 17 * * figure 2 *; | [E]WO2008072750 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [E] 3 * page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 23 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2006180887 (ONO ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 3 * paragraphs [0043] - [0050] * * figures 3a, 3b, 3c * | International search | [A]JP2001351997 (CANON KK); | [A]WO2005093826 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004311593 (SHARP KK); | [AP]US2007007643 (OH KWANG JAE [KR], et al) |