EP2091257 - CODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Toshihiro c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Keiichi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi, 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/52] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
TANAKA, Toshihiro, c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIDA, Keiichi, c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Dev. Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome huo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2017/52] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Ehlers, Jochen Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07829562.3 | 11.10.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007JP69824 | Priority number, date | JP20060323384 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006323384 | [2009/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008065814 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091257 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091257 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/126, H04N19/13, H04N19/149, H04N19/15, H04N19/194, H04N19/436, H04N19/46, H04N19/70, H03M7/40 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
H03M7/4006 (EP,US);
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/15 (EP,US);
H04N19/194 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | H04N7/30, H03M7/40, H04N1/41, H04N7/26 | ||
Former IPC [2009/34] | H04N7/30, H03M7/40, H04N1/41 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/52] |
Former [2010/01] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KODIERGERÄT | [2009/34] | English: | CODER | [2009/34] | French: | CODEUR | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2009 | Translation filed | 04.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 01.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5809176 (YAJIMA AKIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 10; figure 1A * * column 11, line 11 - column 12, line 67; figures 2,3,4 * * column 15, line 8 - line 18; figure 7 * * column 13, line 10 - column 15, line 7; figure 8A * * column 27, line 28 - column 28, line 60; figures 14,15 * * column 28, line 61 - line 67; figure 26 *; | [A]US5870145 (YADA ATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 28 - column 7, line 67; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006176953 (MOHSENIAN NADER [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051]; figure 5C * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figure 6 *; | [A] - MARPE D ET AL, "Context-based adaptive binary arithmetic coding in the H.264/AVC video compression standard", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030701), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 620 - 636, XP011099255 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.815173 | International search | [A]JP2003018593 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2004135252 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2004135251 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2005151391 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2005184232 (SONY CORP); | [A] - YAMAKAGE T., NAKAJO K., KOTO S., "HD DVD ni Mochiiru Dogazo Fugoka Gijutsu", TOSHIBA REVIEW, (20050101), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 17 - 20, XP003013000 | by applicant | JP2005203905 | JP2005318296 | JP2006323384 |