EP2078527 - AQUEOUS LIQUID PREPARATION COMPRISING GATIFLOXACIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWA, Shirou SENJU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Kobe Creative Center 5-4, Murotani 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2241 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/29] | Gillard, Richard Edward, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07829585.4 | 11.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP69847 | Priority number, date | JP20060279009 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006279009 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044734 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078527 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61K9/08, A61K47/10, A61K47/36, A61P27/02, A61P31/04 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/47 (KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | GATIFLOXACIN ENTHALTENDE WÄSSRIGE FLÜSSIGE ZUBEREITUNG | [2009/29] | English: | AQUEOUS LIQUID PREPARATION COMPRISING GATIFLOXACIN | [2009/29] | French: | PRÉPARATION LIQUIDE AQUEUSE COMPRENANT DE LA GATIFLOXACINE | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2009 | Translation filed | 12.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 20.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1839840 ; | [A]EP1025846 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] * * example 5 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 08, Database accession no. 2007-074522, XP002663423 & CN1839840 A 20061004 (ZHANG H) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]CN1839840 (ZHANG HONGYE [CN]); | [Y]CN1562030 (UNIV SHENYANG PHARMACY [CN]); | [Y]WO0010570 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2005000307 (SANTEN PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH089597B | JP2002037746 | JPS63174930 | WO0010570 |