EP2078875 - SLIDE BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2019/23] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUYAMA, Yutaka TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 4718571 / JP | [2012/51] |
Former [2009/29] | 01 /
MATSUYAMA, Yutaka TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 4718571 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/51] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/29] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07829664.7 | 12.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP69928 | Priority number, date | JP20060279192 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006279192 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008047701 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078875 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078875 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2078875 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/10, F16C9/02, F16C17/02 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
F16C17/02 (KR);
F16C17/022 (EP,US);
F16C33/046 (EP,US);
F16C33/10 (KR);
F16C33/106 (EP,US);
F16C9/02 (EP,KR,US);
F01M2001/062 (EP,US);
F01M2011/026 (EP,US);
F16C2240/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITLAGER | [2009/29] | English: | SLIDE BEARING | [2009/29] | French: | PALIER LISSE | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | Translation filed | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2013
24.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Mehler Achler, et al, et al Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/25] |
Former [2013/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2013
24.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Federal-Mogul Wiesbaden GmbH Stielstrasse 11 65201 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Achler, Matthias, et al, et al Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstr. 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | 29.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.04.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 23.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.08.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.04.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T1863/18 | 08.08.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2007 | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | NL | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | IE | 12.10.2013 | LU | 12.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 12.10.2007 | |
AT | 19.12.2012 | ||
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
LU | 12.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 12.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005069283 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006]; figures 13,14 *; | [A]US2003179966 (HOJO ATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [0067]; figure 4 *; | [A]JPH0432320U (-) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,5 * | International search | [Y]JP2005249024 (DAIDO METAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005069284 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2005076755 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2004340249 (DAIDO METAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH1030419 (NIPPON SOKEN); | [A]JPH04219521 (GEN MOTORS CORP) | by applicant | JP2005249024 | JP2005069283 | US2003179966 | Opposition | EP1510709 | - << | - << | - << | - << |