|
22.03.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
04.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.08.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
23.07.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
46 |