EP2078696 - MESOPOROUS SILICA PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Toshihiro c/o Kao Corporation, Wakayama Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA, Takuya c/o Kao Corporation, Wakayama Research Laboratories, 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi, Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07829819.7 | 15.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP70085 | Priority number, date | JP20060295958 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006295958 | JP20060337561 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006337561 | JP20070011776 | 22.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007011776 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053695 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078696 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B37/02, C01B33/18, B01J20/28, B01J20/32, B01J21/08, B01J35/02, B01J35/08, B01J35/10, B01J20/10 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/103 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28021 (EP,US);
B01J20/28061 (EP,US);
B01J20/28064 (EP,US);
B01J20/28066 (EP,US);
B01J20/28083 (EP,US);
B01J20/3293 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/51 (EP,US);
B01J35/617 (EP,US);
C01B33/18 (EP,US);
Y10S977/773 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | C01B37/02, C01B33/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | MESOPORÖSE SILICIUMDIOXIDTEILCHEN | [2009/29] | English: | MESOPOROUS SILICA PARTICLES | [2009/29] | French: | PARTICULES DE SILICE MÉSOPOREUSE | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2009 | Translation filed | 21.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 25.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5922299 (BRUINSMA PAUL J [US], et al); | [A]US6221326 (AMICHE FREDERIC [FR]); | [XA]US2005244322 (CHEN JIANFENG [CN], et al); | International search | [A]JPH11278825 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [A]JP2006102592 (SHIGA PREF GOV, et al); | by applicant | JP2000219770 | JP2006102592 |