EP2077461 - CAMERA MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIDAN, Atsushi SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
IMAI, Satoshi SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
ICHIKAWA, Mitsuru SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
OKABE, Takahiro c/o SONY EMCS CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
KANAI, Fujio SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/01] |
Former [2009/28] | 01 /
HORIDAN, Atsushi SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
IMAI, Satoshi SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
03 /
ICHIKAWA, Mitsuru SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
04 /
OKABE, Takahiro c/o SONY EMCS CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
05 /
KANAI, Fujio SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07830004.3 | 17.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007JP70270 | Priority number, date | JP20060293144 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006293144 | [2009/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053710 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077461 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077461 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/04, H04N5/225, H04N5/335 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
G02B7/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/0015 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/009 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/02 (KR);
H04N23/54 (KR);
H04N23/57 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL | [2009/28] | English: | CAMERA MODULE | [2009/28] | French: | MODULE D'APPAREIL PHOTO | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | Translation filed | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 01.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004130808 (YONEYAMA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004207745 (TSURUTA TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2005008309 (M2SYS CO LTD [KR], et al) | International search | [X]JPH0486729 (CANON KK); | [X]JPH04293005 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH08149777 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2000321475 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2004138992 (SHICOH ENG CO LTD); | [X]JP2004184779 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [Y]JP2005295228 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [XP]JP2006345589 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2002023037 |