EP2077598 - STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 3-15, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIO, Masaki 592-29, Oaza Honjo Honjomachi Saga-shi Saga 8400027 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Toshihiko Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 1, Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5100842 / JP | 03 /
MORIYAMA, Nariaki Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 1, Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5100842 / JP | 04 /
HONMA, Masatoshi Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 1, Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5100842 / JP | 05 /
SUITA, Tokuo Central Research Institute ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 5250025 / JP | 06 /
TANIGUCHI, Hirofumi Yokkaichi Plant ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 1, Ishiharacho Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5100842 / JP | 07 /
SOTOKAWA, Tomoyuki Central Research Institute ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 3-1, Nishishibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 5250025 / JP | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830152.0 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007JP70418 | Priority number, date | JP20060285796 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006285796 | [2009/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008047898 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077598 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M4/485, H01M4/587, H01G11/46 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
C01G23/04 (KR);
H01G11/06 (EP,US);
H01G11/46 (EP,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | H01M10/40, H01G9/038, H01G9/058, H01M4/48, H01M4/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | LAGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/28] | English: | STORAGE DEVICE | [2009/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2009 | Translation filed | 16.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 02.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006003229 (SAI-CHEONG CHUNG [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033] * * figure 1 * [I] 9,10; | [X]US2005221187 (INAGAKI HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] , [0103] - [0105] - [0131] *; | [X]US2005221188 (TAKAMI NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0029] , [0051] - [0052] *; | [X]EP1207572 (SUGNAUX CONSULTING DR [CH]) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0056] , [0060] , [0094] , [0108] * | International search | [X]JPH028420B ; | [A]WO2004034491 (FDK CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JPH0757780 (SEIKO INSTR INC, et al); | [XE]JP2007305625 (YOSHIO MASAYUKI, et al) | by applicant | JP2005294780 | JP2007221311 | JP2007223722 |