EP2077287 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOFT POLYURETHANE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takayuki c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | 02 /
KAKU, Daisuke c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Takashi c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | 04 /
KUMAGAI, Naohiro c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | [2013/26] |
Former [2009/28] | 01 /
SASAKI, Takayuki c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | ||
02 /
KAKU, Daisuke c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | |||
03 /
ITO, Takashi c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | |||
04 /
KUMAGAI, Naohiro c/o Asahi Glass Urethane Co., Ltd. 25, Towada Kamisu-city Ibaraki 3140195 / JP | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/28] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershauser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830573.7 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007JP70839 | Priority number, date | JP20060290040 | 25.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006290040 | [2009/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050841 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077287 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077287 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G101/00 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
C08G18/283 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C08G18/16 (KR);
C08G18/4812 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/04 (KR);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0058 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0083 (EP,US);
C08G2350/00 (KR);
C08G2650/24 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHAN-WEICHSCHAUMSTOFF | [2009/28] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SOFT POLYURETHANE FOAM | [2009/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MOUSSE DE POLYURÉTHANE SOUPLE | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2009 | Translation filed | 20.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 28.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2007 | AT | 26.06.2013 | BE | 26.06.2013 | CY | 26.06.2013 | CZ | 26.06.2013 | EE | 26.06.2013 | FI | 26.06.2013 | LT | 26.06.2013 | LV | 26.06.2013 | MC | 26.06.2013 | MT | 26.06.2013 | NL | 26.06.2013 | PL | 26.06.2013 | RO | 26.06.2013 | SE | 26.06.2013 | SI | 26.06.2013 | SK | 26.06.2013 | TR | 26.06.2013 | BG | 26.09.2013 | GR | 27.09.2013 | ES | 07.10.2013 | IE | 25.10.2013 | LU | 25.10.2013 | IS | 26.10.2013 | PT | 28.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 26.06.2013 | ||
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
TR | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
MC | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
NL | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
ES | 07.10.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
PL | 26.06.2013 | ||
RO | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
SK | 26.06.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
IS | 26.10.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 26.06.2013 | |
BE | 26.06.2013 | ||
EE | 26.06.2013 | ||
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 26.06.2013 | |
FI | 26.06.2013 | ||
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
PT | 28.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
LV | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
BG | 26.09.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 26.06.2013 | |
LT | 26.06.2013 | ||
SE | 26.06.2013 | ||
SI | 26.06.2013 | ||
GR | 27.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 26.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005038133 (NEFF RAYMOND A [US], et al) [I] 4,6 * paragraphs [0007] , [0033] , [0034] , [0039] , [0040] , [0043]; claim - *; | [A]JPH04146916 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0913414 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * examples 225,26,30,31 *; | [A]JPH05287047 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XP]WO2006115169 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-10 * examples 3,4,6,14,15 *; | EP1889861 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * examples 3,4,6,14,15 *; | [E]EP1995263 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-10 * examples 3,6,33-36 * | International search | [X]JP2004300352 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [X]JP2002293867 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X]JP2004527623 ; | [X]JP2006282936 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]JP2006249270 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JPH11286566 | JP2004002594 | JP2004043561 | JPH09151234 | JP2004300352 | JP2003522235 | JP2004530767 | JP2006063254 | JPS4627250B |