EP2099090 - DYE-SENSITIZED SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | For all designated states Electric Power Development Co., Ltd. 15-1 Ginza 6-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048165 / JP | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Yuki NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 5678680 / JP | 02 /
IGARASHI, Kazumasa NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 5678680 / JP | 03 /
HIWATASHI, Kenichi ELECTRIC POWER DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. Technology Development Center 1-9-88, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | 04 /
MASUYAMA, Naoto ELECTRIC POWER DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. Technology Development Center 1-9-88, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Yuki NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 5678680 / JP | ||
02 /
IGARASHI, Kazumasa NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 5678680 / JP | |||
03 /
HIWATASHI, Kenichi ELECTRIC POWER DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. Technology Development Center 1-9-88, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | |||
04 /
MASUYAMA, Naoto ELECTRIC POWER DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. Technology Development Center 1-9-88, Chigasaki Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 2530041 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830612.3 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007JP70878 | Priority number, date | JP20060304663 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006304663 | JP20070110739 | 19.04.2007 Original published format: JP 2007110739 | [2009/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008056545 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2099090 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2099090 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M14/00, H01L31/04, H01M2/08, H01G9/20 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
H01G9/2077 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/2031 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/2059 (EP,KR,US);
H01M14/005 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/37] | H01M14/00, H01L31/04, H01M2/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | FARBSTOFFSENSIBILISIERTE SOLARZELLE | [2009/37] | English: | DYE-SENSITIZED SOLAR CELL | [2009/37] | French: | CELLULE SOLAIRE SENSIBILISÉE À UN COLORANT | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2009 | Translation filed | 04.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 20.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2007 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | IE | 26.10.2012 | LU | 26.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
LU | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 26.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006185646 ; | [Y]JP2006012673 ; | [Y]JP2001089616 ; | [IY]EP1548867 (THREE BOND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 6,8,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0021] - [0023] - [0027] , [0028] * * figure 1 * [Y] 1,3-5,7,9,11,13; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 58, Database accession no. 2006-562372, XP002656197 & JP2006185646 A 20060713 (TOKYO THREE BOND CO LTD) [Y] 1-5,7,9,11,13 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 07, Database accession no. 2006-062578, XP002656198 & JP2006012673 A 20060112 (SHINETSU POLYMER KK) [Y] 1-5,7,9,11,13 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 56, Database accession no. 2001-505113, XP002656199 & JP2001089616 A 20010403 (MITSUI DU PONT POLYCHEMICAL KK) [Y] 2 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH05335612 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JP2001089616 (MITSUI DU PONT POLYCHEMICAL); | [A]JP2001298208 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JP2006012673 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [Y]JP2006185646 (THREE BOND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2000030767 | JP2004095248 |