EP2077430 - SQUIB, GAS GENERATION DEVICE FOR AIRBAG, AND GAS GENERATION DEVICE FOR SEAT BELT PRETENSIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nipponkayaku Kabushikikaisha 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Shigeru NIPPONKAYAKU KABUSHIKIKAISHA Himeji Plant 3903-39, Toyotomi Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792123 / JP | 02 /
MUKUNOKI, Hirotaka NIPPONKAYAKU KABUSHIKIKAISHA Himeji Plant 3903-39, Toyotomi Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792123 / JP | 03 /
KOIKE, Hideyuki NIPPONKAYAKU KABUSHIKIKAISHA Himeji Plant 3903-39, Toyotomi Toyotomi-cho Himeji-shi Hyogo 6792123 / JP | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830644.6 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007JP70910 | Priority number, date | JP20060291301 | 26.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006291301 | [2009/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050860 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077430 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/12, B60R21/26, B60R22/46, F42B3/103, F42B3/198, B60R21/264 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
B60R21/2644 (EP,US);
F42B3/103 (EP,US);
F42B3/121 (EP,US);
F42B3/198 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | F42B3/12, B60R21/26, B60R22/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | ANZÜNDER, GASERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AIRBAG UND GASERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SITZGURTVORSPANNER | [2009/28] | English: | SQUIB, GAS GENERATION DEVICE FOR AIRBAG, AND GAS GENERATION DEVICE FOR SEAT BELT PRETENSIONER | [2009/28] | French: | AMORCE, DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE GAZ POUR COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE GAZ POUR PRÉTENDEUR DE CEINTURE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2009 | Translation filed | 27.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 03.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0043727 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 5, line 3 - page 14, line 7 * * figures 3,5 *; | [Y]EP1043201 (SHOWA KINZOKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, lines 25-27 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP3118048U (NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [Y] 2 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1548391 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [A] 1 | International search | [Y]JP2002535195 ; | [Y]JP3118048U ; | [A]JP2006078101 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) | by applicant | FR2704944 | US5544585 | JP3294582B | EP1256775 | JP2001140468 | JP2002362992 |