EP2078319 - MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL AND POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Kazuhiro CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 1468501 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830897.0 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP71163 | Priority number, date | JP20060299470 | 02.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006299470 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053905 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078319 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M4/86, H01M8/06, H01M8/10, H01M8/04 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M4/86 (KR);
H01M8/04119 (EP,US);
H01M8/04156 (EP,US);
H01M8/10 (KR);
H01M2250/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | H01M8/02, H01M4/86, H01M8/06, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE POLYMERELEKTROLYT-BRENNSTOFFZELLE UND POLYMERELEKTROLYT-BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2009/29] | English: | MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL AND POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL | [2009/29] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉLECTRODES À MEMBRANE POUR PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À ÉLECTROLYTE POLYMÈRE ET CETTE PILE POLYMÈRE | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 24.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/43] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/44] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5958616 (SALINAS CARLOS [US], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]JP2001085033 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] *; | [X]JP2005032681 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2006040767 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XP]JP2007141588 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2005038780 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2004327358 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2002042823 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2005310545 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | US2003044672 |