EP1948929 - COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAGI, Akio, Matsushita Electric Indust. Co., Ltd, IP Rights OC IP Development Ctr 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
YAGI, Akio, c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd, IP Rights Operations Company, IP Development Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07831780.7 | 07.11.2007 | [2008/31] | WO2007JP72050 | Priority number, date | JP20060306362 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006306362 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059850 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948929 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948929 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/02, F04B39/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F04B39/0246 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/0005 (KR);
F04B39/0022 (KR);
F04B39/0061 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/0094 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/023 (KR);
F04B39/0261 (KR);
F04B39/122 (KR);
F04B9/045 (KR);
F25B31/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2010/02] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTER | [2008/31] | English: | COMPRESSOR | [2008/31] | French: | COMPRESSEUR | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1408235 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2002050425 (IVERSEN FRANK HOLM [DK], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039] * * figure - *; | [A]US5842420 (KHOO CHEW THONG [SG], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 28 - line 65 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]GB2103759 (ASPERA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * figure - * |