EP2085392 - HALOALKYLSULFONANILIDE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF, HERBICIDE COMPRISING THE DERIVATIVE AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT, AND USE OF THE HERBICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku CO., LTD. 2-5 Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8236 / JP | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINO, Tomokazu NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD. RESEARCH CENTER 345 Oyamadacho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Yasuko NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., RESEARCH CENTER 345 Oyamadacho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 03 /
SHIGENARI, Toshihiko NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD. RESEARCH CENTER 345 Oyamadacho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 04 /
MAMETSUKA, Koki NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., RESEARCH CENTER 345 Oyamadacho Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07831986.0 | 16.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007JP72256 | Priority number, date | JP20060312140 | 17.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006312140 | [2009/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059948 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085392 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/08, A01N47/04, A01P13/00, C07D265/10, C07D267/06, A01N33/18, A01N43/72, A01N43/86 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
C07D265/08 (EP,KR,US);
A01N33/18 (KR);
A01N43/72 (EP,US);
A01N43/76 (EP,US);
C07D265/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D267/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | HALOGENALKYLSULFONANILIDDERIVAT ODER SALZ DAVON, DAS DERIVAT ALS WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTENDES HERBIZID UND ANWENDUNG DES HERBIZIDS | [2009/32] | English: | HALOALKYLSULFONANILIDE DERIVATIVE OR SALT THEREOF, HERBICIDE COMPRISING THE DERIVATIVE AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT, AND USE OF THE HERBICIDE | [2009/32] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'HALOALKYLSULFONANILIDE OU SEL DE CELUI-CI, HERBICIDE COMPRENANT LE DÉRIVÉ COMME INGRÉDIENT ACTIF, ET UTILISATION DE L'HERBICIDE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2009 | Translation filed | 23.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2000247814 (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO); | [A]JP2003055346 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]WO2004011429 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005314407 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD); | [Y]WO2006090792 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2004107322 | JP2006265240 | - TETRAHEDRONLETT., (1990), vol. 31, page 4661 | - SYNTH. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 24, no. 10, page 1415 | - BULL. SOC. CHIM. FR., (1943), vol. 10, page 347 | - "Shin Jikken Kagaku Kouza" ("New Experimental Chemistry Series")", Chemical Society of Japan, MARUZEN CO., (1977), vol. 15, pages 198 - 199 |