EP2083114 - FIBER PRODUCT-TREATING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOU, Masatsugu Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
SASADA, Kouji Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
KINOSHITA, Hayato Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 04 /
ISHIKAWA, Akira Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | [2013/52] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
ITOU, Masatsugu Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | ||
02 /
SASADA, Kouji Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | |||
03 /
KINOSHITA, Hayato Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | |||
04 /
ISHIKAWA, Akira Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07832062.9 | 12.11.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007JP72332 | Priority number, date | JP20060306753 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006306753 | [2009/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059978 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083114 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083114 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/643, D06M13/328, D06M13/463, D06M15/53, D06M15/61, D06M15/647, D06M15/507 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
D06M15/6436 (EP,US);
D06M13/328 (EP,US);
D06M13/463 (EP,US);
D06M15/507 (EP,US);
D06M15/53 (EP,US);
D06M15/61 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/31] | D06M15/643, D06M13/328, D06M13/463, D06M15/53, D06M15/61 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | FASERPRODUKTBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL | [2009/31] | English: | FIBER PRODUCT-TREATING AGENT | [2009/31] | French: | AGENT DE TRAITEMENT DE PRODUIT FIBREUX | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2009 | Translation filed | 16.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2007 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.11.2007 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0220156 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [I] 1-3 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 10 *; | [I]WO9927050 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-7 * page 28, paragraph 2 * * page 29, paragraph last * * page 36, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 44, lines 3-5 * * page 56, paragraph last - page 57, paragraph last * | International search | [A]WO9524460 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]JPH09291483 (TAKAMATSU YUSHI KK); | [A]JPS60259680 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO); | [A]US4956447 (GOSSELINK EUGENE P [US], et al); | [A]EP0185427 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]US5207933 (TRINH TOAN [US], et al); | [AP]JP2007284818 (KAO CORP) | by applicant | JP2007046171 | JPH05508889 | JP2001279581 | JP2000110076 | JPH09291483 | EP0220156 | WO9927050 | WO9524460 |