EP2073997 - A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLET, Christophe 55, rue de l'église FR-78320 Levis Saint Nom / FR | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07835057.6 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007SE00853 | Priority number, date | GB20060019725 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: GB 0619725 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008041904 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073997 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/0134, G06K9/00 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
B60R21/0132 (EP,GB,US);
G06V20/56 (US);
B60R22/46 (GB);
G06V20/588 (EP);
B60R2021/01265 (EP);
B60R2021/01272 (EP,GB);
B60R2021/01304 (EP);
B60R2021/0293 (EP,GB);
B60R2021/165 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | B60R21/0134 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | STEUERSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2009/27] | English: | A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2009/27] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 08.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.09.2019 | 04.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/12] | 08.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004016870 (PAWLICKI JOHN A [US], et al); | [X]US2005033516 (KAWASAKI TOMOYA [JP]); | [XI]US2005090955 (ENGELMAN GERALD H [US], et al); | [A]US2005107955 (ISAJI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1577177 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) | International search | [X]EP1577177 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005096011 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102004026638 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]); | [A]DE102005003354 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) |