EP2263007 - ENERGY GENERATOR, MACHINE FOR GENERATING ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tatlisarap, Mehmet Eylauer Strasse 26 10965 Berlin / DE | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Tatlisarap, Mehmet Atakent M. Elvankent A.12 Blok No:23 Etimesgut Ankara / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/51] | Application number, filing date | 07835599.7 | 06.09.2007 | [2010/51] | WO2007TR00087 | Priority number, date | DE20061042411 | 06.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006042411 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009061285 | Date: | 14.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2263007 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F03G7/10 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
F03G7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | ENERGIEERZEUGER - MASCHINE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ENERGIE | [2010/51] | English: | ENERGY GENERATOR, MACHINE FOR GENERATING ENERGY | [2010/51] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'ÉNERGIE - MACHINE À GÉNÉRER DE L'ÉNERGIE | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 15.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 08.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2010 | 30.09.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0929141 (LIU SHIH CHEN [TW]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2800424 (KHAKHOULIA JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005153806 (HUANG TA SHENG [TW]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |