EP2025032 - MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLIES PREPARED FROM FLUOROPOLYMER DISPERSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOUSENBERG, Robert, D. 2103 Anson Road Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude Cabinet Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude Cabinet Hirsch 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07835779.5 | 31.05.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US12872 | Priority number, date | US20060810096P | 01.06.2006 Original published format: US 810096 P | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013601 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025032 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C08J5/225 (EP,US);
C08J5/2237 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1072 (EP,US);
H01M8/1081 (EP,US);
H01M8/1088 (EP,US);
C08J2327/12 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/26] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMBRAN-ELEKTRODENANORDNUNGEN AUS FLUORPOLYMER-DISPERSIONEN | [2009/08] | English: | MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLIES PREPARED FROM FLUOROPOLYMER DISPERSIONS | [2009/08] | French: | ENSEMBLES D'ÉLECTRODES À MEMBRANE PRÉPARÉES À PARTIR DE DISPERSIONS DE POLYMÈRES FLUORÉS | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 06.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1359142 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 25-36 * paragraphs [0024] - [0053] - [0260] - [0298] * * claims 25-42 * * examples 16,17,26,27,29-31 * [Y] 1-24; | [Y]US2005124769 (HARING THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 1-24 * paragraphs [0161] , [0162] *; | [A]US2002160271 (FRECH ROGER E [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * the whole document * |