EP2044457 - A METHOD FOR INCREASING THE RELIABILITY OF POSITION INFORMATION WHEN TRANSITIONING FROM A REGIONAL, WIDE-AREA, OR GLOBAL CARRIER-PHASE DIFFERENTIAL NAVIGATION (WADGPS) TO A LOCAL REAL-TIME KINEMATIC (RTK) NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/20] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Navcom Technology, Inc. 20780 Madrona Avenue Torrance California 90503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESLINGER, Daniel, J. 2113 Clark Lane Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | 02 /
SUN, Jing 4007 West 242nd Street, K5 Torrance, CA 90505 / US | 03 /
SHARPE, Richard, T. 5212 Onyx Street Torrance, CA 90503 / US | 04 /
NELSON, Frederick, W. 1935 Olson Drive Waukee, IA 50263 / US | 05 /
PICKETT, Terence, D. 4140 114th Street Urbandale, IA 50322 / US | 06 /
HATCH, Ronald, R. 1142 Lakme Avenue Wilmington, CA 90744 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2009/15] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07835805.8 | 13.06.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US13814 | Priority number, date | US20060457745 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: US 457745 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008008146 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2044457 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044457 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/48 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G01S19/48 (EP,US);
G01S19/43 (EP,US);
G01S19/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2015/33] |
Former [2009/33] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT VON POSITIONSDATEN BEIM ÜBERGANG VON EINEM REGIONALEN, WEITBEREICHS- ODER GLOBALEN TRÄGERPHASEN-DIFFERENTIAL-NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM (WADGPS) ZU EINEM LOKALEN KINEMATISCHEN ECHTZEITNAVIGATIONSSYSTEM (RTK) | [2015/14] | English: | A METHOD FOR INCREASING THE RELIABILITY OF POSITION INFORMATION WHEN TRANSITIONING FROM A REGIONAL, WIDE-AREA, OR GLOBAL CARRIER-PHASE DIFFERENTIAL NAVIGATION (WADGPS) TO A LOCAL REAL-TIME KINEMATIC (RTK) NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2009/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DE LA FIABILITÉ D'INFORMATION DE POSITION LORS DU PASSAGE D'UN SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION DIFFÉRENTIELLE À PHASE DE PORTEUSE RÉGIONAL, LONGUE PORTÉE OU MONDIAL (WADGPS) À UN SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION LOCAL CINÉMATIQUE EN TEMPS RÉEL (RTK) | [2015/14] |
Former [2009/15] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT VON POSITIONSDATEN BEI ÜBERTRAGUNGEN VON EINEM REGIONAL-, WEITBEREICHS- ODER GLOBALTRÄGERPHASEN-NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM ZU EINEM LOKALEN KINEMATISCHEN ECHTZEITNAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2009/15] | PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DE LA FIABILITÉ D'INFORMATION DE POSITION LORS DU PASSAGE D'UNE NAVIGATION DIFFÉRENTIELLE À PHASE DE PORTEUSE RÉGIONAL, LONGUE PORTÉE OU MONDIAL (WADGPS) À UN SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION LOCAL CINÉMATIQUE EN TEMPS RÉEL (RTK) | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | [2016/21] |
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003011511 (KING THOMAS M [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * figure 1 * * abstract * * paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US6531981 (FULLER RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [Y]US2005151683 (SHARPE RICHARD T [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [A] - VAN NORDEN M F ET AL, "Concept for Military Surveys to IHO Standards Without Shore Stations Using the Real-Time Gipsy (RTG) Global Positioning System (GPS)", OCEANS, 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF MTS/IEEE WASHINGTON, DC, USA 18-23 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050918), ISBN 0-933957-34-3, pages 1 - 7, XP010920773 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/OCEANS.2005.1639822 | by applicant | US2003011511 | US2005151683 |