EP2046225 - MARKER FORMED OF STARCH OR OTHER SUITABLE POLYSACCHARIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 1625 West 3rd Street Tempe, AZ 85280-1740 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 3 Morgan Irvine, CA 92618 / US | ||
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 11 Columbia, Suite A Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 3 Morgan Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Michael 6332 Camino Marinero San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | 02 /
LUBOCK, Paul 9 Pawtucket Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Tomlinson, Edward James, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68 81630 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Barz, Peter Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07836287.8 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US16902 | Priority number, date | US20060835740P | 04.08.2006 Original published format: US 835740 P | US20070881264 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: US 881264 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008019001 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2046225 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00831 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3925 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS STÄRKE ODER EINEM ANDEREN GEEIGNETEN POLYSACCHARID GEFORMTER MARKER | [2009/16] | English: | MARKER FORMED OF STARCH OR OTHER SUITABLE POLYSACCHARIDE | [2009/16] | French: | MARQUEUR CONSTITUÉ D'AMIDON OU D'UN AUTRE POLYSACCHARIDE APPROPRIÉ | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 13.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004105626 (SENORX INC [US]) [X] 1-34,35-41 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0026] , [0029] , [0031]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO2005039446 (RUBICOR MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-34,35,37-40 * page 2, lines 20-25; figures 9,13e; claims 15,18 *; | [X]US2002058882 (FULTON RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,15-24,30-33,35,37,40,41 * paragraph [0030]; figure 7; claims 14,16,20 *; | [XY]US2005119562 (JONES MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-29,35-40 * the whole document * [Y] 2-40; | [XY]US2003233101 (LUBOCK PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0062] , [0064] - [0066]; figures 1A,6 * [Y] 2-40; | [A]US2004101479 (BURBANK FRED H [US], et al) [A] 30-34,35 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2002188196 (BURBANK FRED H [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,8,26,62 *; | [A]EP1493451 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0033] *; | [A]GB708148 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 55-59 *; | [A]WO2005089664 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [A] 34 * abstract *; | [A]EP0402955 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [A] 35,41 * column 8; figure 8 *; | [A]EP1281416 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 35,41 * abstract * |