EP2047687 - ADAPTIVE GEOMETRIC PARTITIONING FOR VIDEO ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing DTV 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIVORRA ESCODA, Oscar 1201 Sayre Drive Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
YIN, Peng 6 John Street Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [2018/20] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
DIVORRA ESCODA, Oscar 1201 Sayre Drive Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
02 /
YIN, Peng 65 Warwick Road West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US | Representative(s) | Rolland, Sophie, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Rolland, Sophie, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | Rittner, Karsten Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07836376.9 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US17118 | Priority number, date | US20060834993P | 02.08.2006 Original published format: US 834993 P | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008016609 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047687 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047687 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
H04N19/57 (EP,US);
H04N19/119 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/126 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (EP,US);
H04N19/146 (EP,US);
H04N19/156 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/189 (US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/507 (US);
H04N19/543 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | H04N7/26, H04N7/32, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/20] |
Former [2009/41] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE GEOMETRISCHE PARTITIONIERUNG ZUR KODIERUNG VON VIDEO-INHALTEN | [2009/16] | English: | ADAPTIVE GEOMETRIC PARTITIONING FOR VIDEO ENCODING | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE SEGMENTATION GÉOMÉTRIQUE ADAPTATIVE UTILISÉS POUR LE CODAGE VIDÉO | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 10.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XIY] - KONDO S ET AL, "A Motion Compensation Technique Using Sliced Blocks In Hybrid Video Coding", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP 2005), IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, US, (20050911), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-9134-9, pages 305 - 308, XP010851050 [X] 1-5,7,12,13,15-19,21-23,25,28-32,34,39,40,42-46,48-50,52,55 * abstract * * page 305, column L, line 19 - page 306, column R, line L * * page 308, column L, line 1 - line 7 * * table I * [I] 6,8-11,24,26,27,33,35-38,51,53,54 [Y] 14,20,41,47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2005.1530052 | [Y] - RUHL G, Simulation eines Verfahrens zur Bewegungsschätzung und -segmentierung in digitalen Bildsequenzen unter Verwendung eines Blockverzerrungsmodells. PASSAGE, BERLIN, DE, TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITÄT BERLIN, INSTITUT FÜR FERNMELDETECHNIK, (199602), XP002492446 [Y] 14,20,41,47 * page 31, line 19 - page 33, line 8 * * figures 3.8,3.9 * | [A] - BRONSHTEIN I N ET AL, Handbook of mathematics. PASSAGE, BERLIN, SPRINGER, (2004), XP002492447 [A] 6,33 * page 194, line 15 - page 195, line 15 * | [A] - OHM J-R, Multimedia Communication Technology. 11 Quantization and Coding, BERLIN, DE, SPRINGER, (2004), XP002492448 [A] 8-11,24,27,35-38,51,54 * page 445, line 1 - page 450, line 10 * * page 458, line 1 - line 29 * * page 475, line 10 - line 34 * | [A] - OHM, J-R, Multimedia Communication Technology. 5.2 Signal Enhancement, BERLIN, DE, SPRINGER, (2004), XP002492449 [A] 26,53 * page 181, column 15 - page 182, column 19 * | [PX] - HUNG E M ET AL, "On Macroblock Partition for Motion Compensation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2006 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP 2006), IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, US, (20061008), vol. 1, ISBN 1-4244-0481-9, pages 1697 - 1700, XP031048982 [PX] 1,5,6,28,32,33,55 * the whole document * | [PX] - DIVORRA Ò ET AL, "Geometry-adaptive Block Partioning", VIDEO STANDARDS AND DRAFTS, ITU - Telecommunications Standardization Sector, STUDY GROUP 16 Question 6, Video Coding Experts Group (VCEG), 32nd Meeting, San Jose, CA, US, (20070420), no. VCEG-AF10, pages 1 - 8, XP030003531 [PX] 1-55 * the whole document * |