EP2057534 - Traction control system for 4WD/AWD vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/20] | TRACTION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR 4WD/AWD VEHICLES | ||
[2011/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Powertrain USA, Inc. 1775 Research Drive Troy, MI 48083 / US | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZALEWSKI, John, D. 3925 Gristmill Circle Liverpool, New York 13090 / US | 02 /
FAIRBANKS, Charles 208 Blackberry Rd Liverpool, New York 13090 / US | 03 /
NIEDERBACHER, Gunter 5036 Clarkston Road Clarkston, Michigan 48348 / US | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
ZALEWSKI, John, D. 3925 Gristmill Circle Liverpool, New York 13090 / US | ||
02 /
FAIRBANKS, Charles 1948 Countyline Road Phoenix, New York 13135 / US | |||
03 /
NIEDERBACHER, Gunter 5036 Clarkston Road Clarkston, Michigan 48348 / US | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07837035.0 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007US18325 | Priority number, date | US20060841679P | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 841679 P | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008027224 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2057534 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057534 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60K23/08 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B60K23/08 (EP,US);
B60K17/344 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0075 (EP,US);
B60W2300/185 (EP,US);
B60W2510/10 (EP,US);
B60W2510/18 (EP,US);
B60W2510/30 (EP,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP,US);
B60W2520/14 (EP,US);
B60W2520/16 (EP,US);
B60W2520/18 (EP,US);
B60W2555/20 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/20] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [2009/40] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Traktionssteuerungssystem für Fahrzeuge mit Vierrad-/Allradantrieb | [2011/20] | English: | Traction control system for 4WD/AWD vehicles | [2011/20] | French: | Système de commande de traction pour véhicules à 4 roues motrices/transmission intégrale | [2011/20] |
Former [2009/20] | ZUGSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE MIT VIERRAD-/ALLRADANTRIEB | ||
Former [2009/20] | TRACTION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR 4WD/AWD VEHICLES | ||
Former [2009/20] | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE TRACTION POUR VÉHICULES À 4 ROUES MOTRICES/TRANSMISSION INTÉGRALE | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 12.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4669569 (SUZUKI KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,13-15 * column 6, line 23 - line L *; | [A]EP0352994 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 17 *; | [X]US6094614 (HIWATASHI YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,5-15 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 8 *; | [X]EP1462292 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,9,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0025] *; | [X]EP1495904 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0024] * | International search | [A]US4702341 (TAGA YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [A]US6039138 (SUGIMOTO TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006231315 (HOMAN AKINORI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6094614 | EP1495904 |