EP2074821 - SELECTIVE DISPLAY OF OVERLAY VIDEO STREAMS VIA INTERACTIVE ALERT ICONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The DirecTV Group, Inc. 2230 East Imperial Highway El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states The DirecTV Group, Inc. 2230 E. Imperial Highway El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANKS, David, E. 10420 Scenario Lane Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US | 02 /
PURPURA, Richard, F. 6245 Blairwood Lane Orange, CA 92867 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Matthew, J. 17230 Falda Avenue Torrance, CA 90504 / US | 04 /
FELDSTEIN, David, E. 848 Lincoln Boulevard, Unit P Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07837189.5 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007US18535 | Priority number, date | US20060839624P | 23.08.2006 Original published format: US 839624 P | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008024382 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074821 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4858 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE ANZEIGE VON ÜBERLAGERUNGS-VIDEOSTREAMS DURCH INTERAKTIVE WARNSYMBOLE | [2009/27] | English: | SELECTIVE DISPLAY OF OVERLAY VIDEO STREAMS VIA INTERACTIVE ALERT ICONS | [2009/27] | French: | AFFICHAGE SÉLECTIF DE FLUX VIDÉO DE SUPERPOSITION PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'ICÔNES D'ALERTE INTERACTIVES | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 28.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/15] | 25.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002124255 (REICHARDT M SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-12,18-20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] - [0013] , [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0093] - [0098] - [0100] , [0103] - [0105] - [0107] , [0108] *; | [X]US6526577 (KNUDSON EDWARD B [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-20 * column 1, lines 7-33; figures 1,2a,3,13,16 * * column 2, lines 1-9,41-55 * * column 4, lines 12-32,45-58 * * column 5, lines 4-22,50-56 * * column 6, lines 55-60 * * column 7 * * column 9, lines 35-62 * * columns 11-13 *; | [A]US6593973 (SULLIVAN GARY E [US], et al) [A] 14,15 * abstract ** columns 2,5-6 *; | [X]US2005177850 (BOYLAN PETER C III [US], et al) [X] 1-13,18,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0007] - [0010] - [0033] - [0037] - [0053] - [0058] - [0066] , [0070] * | by applicant | US2002124255 | US6526577 | US2005177850 |