EP2057850 - ACTIVE SIGNAL CROSS-CONNECT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states ADC GMBH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARI, Gabor Loczy Lajos U.6. Vf Szl 1022 Budapest / HU | 02 /
BOKA, Ferenc Romai U. 22 1222 Budapest / HU | 03 /
LOUWAGIE, Dominic J. 15980 North Hillcrest Court Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | 04 /
MEJIA DE AVILA, Alejandro Quinta Rebeca 1481, Fracc. Quintas Del Valle Juarez Chi / MX | 05 /
BALANDRAN, Luis Lorenzo Golfo De Guayaquil 9364, Moderno Juarez CD. Juarez Chi / MX | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07837636.5 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007US19213 | Priority number, date | US20060842178P | 01.09.2006 Original published format: US 842178 P | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008027562 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2057850 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/14 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
H04Q1/142 (EP,US);
H04Q1/06 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVES SIGNALVERNETZUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/20] | English: | ACTIVE SIGNAL CROSS-CONNECT SYSTEM | [2009/20] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTERCONNEXION DE SIGNAL ACTIF | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 14.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5265156 (EASON JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - column 4, line 46 * * column 11, line 36 - column 12, line 58 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]WO9926426 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 17, line 11 - page 21, line 5 * * figures 1,2,4,7,8 * |