EP2081688 - MULTI-COMPONENT PIPETTE TIP AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorenson Bioscience, Inc. 2511 South West Temple Salt Lake City, UT 84115 / US | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRICE, West, L. 937 East Ranch Circle Draper, UT 84020 / US | 02 /
JENSEN, Zackary, J. 3046 South Arthurs Court West Valley City, UT 84120 / US | 03 /
CALDWELL, Tyler, W. 1065 East 8320 South Sandy City, UT 84094 / US | 04 /
STEED, Fredrick, C. 4195 South Rome Way Hurricane, UT 84737 / US | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07838962.4 | 28.09.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007US20885 | Priority number, date | US20060847820P | 28.09.2006 Original published format: US 847820 P | US20070862840 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: US 862840 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008042233 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081688 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B29C45/1676 (EP,US);
B01L3/0279 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B29K2221/003 (EP,US);
B29L2031/753 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTEN-PIPETTENSPITZE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2009/31] | English: | MULTI-COMPONENT PIPETTE TIP AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2009/31] | French: | POINTE DE PIPETTE À PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6482362 (SMITH JAMES C [US]); | [X]US2003156994 (MAHLER PETER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2005039581 (EGGERT DANIEL M [US], et al); | [Y]US2005175511 (COTE RICHARD A [US], et al) |