|
07.01.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.01.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
70 |