EP2081584 - TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION, DEMYELINATION AND NEURONAL/AXONAL LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Government Of The United States Of America As Represented by Secretary of the Dep. of Health and Human Services National Insti National Institute of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Blvd. Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUKALIAK-QUANDT, Jacqueline, A. 5316 Crestedge Lane Rockville, MD 20853 / US | 02 /
HALLENBECK, John, M. 4113 Franklin Street Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 03 /
WAKITA, Hideaki 6-502 Myodaijijutaku 2-3-1 Tatsumiminami Okazaki City, Aichi 444-0874 / JP | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
SHUKALIAK-QUANDT, Jacqueline, A. 5316 Crestedge Lane Rockville, MD 20853 / US | ||
02 /
HALLENBECK, John, M. 4113 Franklin Street Kensington, MD 20895 / US | |||
03 /
WAKITA, Hideaki 257 Congressional Lane Apt. 309 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Representative(s) | Steffan, Gerhard, et al Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/31] | Application number, filing date | 07839447.5 | 09.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007US21682 | Priority number, date | US20060828732P | 09.10.2006 Original published format: US 828732 P | US20070905741P | 08.03.2007 Original published format: US 905741 P | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008045488 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081584 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61P25/00, A61K38/17 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN, DEMYELISATIONEN UND NERVENZELLEN-/AXON-VERLUSTEN | [2009/31] | English: | TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION, DEMYELINATION AND NEURONAL/AXONAL LOSS | [2009/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE L'INFLAMMATION, DE LA DÉMYÉLINISATION ET DE LA PERTE NEURONALE/AXONALE | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 03.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 08.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006099006 (NOVAVAX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 19 - line 20 * * claims 1,22-25 * * page 22, line 20 - page 23, line 13 * * sequences 1-2,5-9 * * page 1, line 22 * * page 11, line 20 - line 21 *; | [X]WO2005016962 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,8,13 * * page 23, line 29 - page 24, line 8 * * page 21, line 21 *; | [X]WO2004043361 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * sequence 384 * * claims 7,12,17 * * page 82, line 32 - page 83, line 9 *; | [X]WO2004056386 (UNIV LEIDEN [NL], et al) [X] 1-5 * sequence 2 * * page 48, line 4 - line 5 *; | [AP]WO2007028133 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [AP] 1-16 * claims 1-31 * * figure 16 * * examples 1-4 *; | [AE]EP1842551 (US HEALTH [US]) [AE] 1-16 * claims 1-20 *; | [A]AU2005235514 (US HEALTH [US]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-27 *; | [X]WO0189557 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 44 * * page 6, paragraph 48 * * claims 3,4,6 * * page 6, paragraph 47 *; | [A]WO0004928 (PHARMASPEC INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,6 *; | [X]US2004009125 (HALLENBECK JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-20 *; | [X]AU2001264813B (THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AS REPRESENTED BY SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVI [US]) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-20 *; | [A] - WANG X ET AL, "DEMONSTRATION OF INCREASED ENDOTHELIAL-LEUKOCYTE ADHESION MOLECULE-1 MRNA EXPRESSION IN RAT ISCHEMIC CORTEX", STROKE, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, DALLAS TX, US, (1995), vol. 26, no. 9, ISSN 0039-2499, pages 1665 - 1669, XP001064744 [A] 1-16 * Abstract * |