EP2092743 - DISTANCE CAMERA HAVING A MEMORY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freedom Scientific Inc. 11800 31st Court North St. Petersburg Florida 33716-1805 / US | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOORHEES, Garald L. 11800 31st Court North St. Petersburg, FL 33716-1805 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/35] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot B.P. No. 74 92703 Colombes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07840076.9 | 16.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US24160 | Priority number, date | US20060560670 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: US 560670 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008063597 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2092743 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/00, G06F17/00, G06K9/32 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | H04N5/76, H04N5/262 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | DISTANZKAMERA MIT SPEICHERMODUL | [2009/35] | English: | DISTANCE CAMERA HAVING A MEMORY MODULE | [2009/35] | French: | CAMÉRA À DISTANCE AYANT UN MODULE DE MÉMOIRE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 10.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/08] | 05.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/08] | 02.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003113035 (CAHILL NATHAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract ** figure 3 *; | [XDI]US6731326 (BETTINARDI EDWARD R [US]) [XD] 1-8,10,11,15,16,18-22,24,25,28-30,33-35 * abstract * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 54 - line 58 * * column 4, line 38 - line 45 * * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 8 * * column 8, line 10 - line 12 * [I] 9,12-14,17,23,26,27,31,32,37,38; | [A]US2006147197 (SPRUCK BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0103] *; | [A]US2006193536 (PILU MAURIZIO [US]) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] * | International search | [Y]US4808987 (TAKEDA HARUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5943679 (NILES LESLIE T [US], et al); | [Y]US6236766 (ZAVALJEVSKI ALEKSANDER [US], et al) | Examination | US5898423 | by applicant | US5898423 |