EP2024195 - METHOD OF SEALING, BAFFLING OR REINFORCING A PORTION OF AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/08] | TOUGHENED ACTIVATABLE MATERIAL FOR SEALING, BAFFLING OR REINFORCING AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME | ||
[2013/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zephyros Inc. 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEASLEY, David 997 Churchill Circle Rochester, MI 48307 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | ||
Former [2009/08] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07840224.5 | 05.06.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US70404 | Priority number, date | US20060804117P | 07.06.2006 Original published format: US 804117 P | US20060828704P | 09.10.2006 Original published format: US 828704 P | US20070757499 | 04.06.2007 Original published format: US 757499 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008014053 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2024195 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024195 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/00, C09J163/00, C08L63/02, C09K3/10 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B60R13/06 (EP,US);
B60R13/07 (EP,US);
B60R13/08 (EP,US);
B62D29/002 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C09J163/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABDICHTUNG, DÄMPFUNG ODER VERSTÄRKUNG VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGTEILEN | [2013/35] | English: | METHOD OF SEALING, BAFFLING OR REINFORCING A PORTION OF AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE | [2013/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SCELLEMENT, DE CHICANAGE OU DE RENFORCEMENT DE PIÈCES AUTOMOBILES | [2013/35] |
Former [2009/08] | VERSTÄRKTES AKTIVIERBARES MATERIAL ZUR ABDICHTUNG, DÄMPFUNG ODER VERSTÄRKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ERZEUGUNG | ||
Former [2009/08] | TOUGHENED ACTIVATABLE MATERIAL FOR SEALING, BAFFLING OR REINFORCING AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME | ||
Former [2009/08] | MATÉRIAU ACTIVABLE RENFORCÉ POUR SCELLEMENT, CHICANAGE OU RENFORCEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2007 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | IE | 05.06.2014 | LU | 05.06.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GB | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.06.2007 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.06.2007 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 05.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006020076 (FINERMAN TERRY [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1,2 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0032] , [0033] , [0039] *; | [Y]US5686509 (NAKAYAMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claim 6 * * column 2, lines 51-62 * * column 3, lines 22-33 *; | [A]EP1359202 (SIKA SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] * claims 1,15,23,25 * | by applicant | US6474723 | US6467834 | US6419305 | US6358584 | US6311452 | US6296298 | US6263635 | US5275853 | US5464924 | US5962093 | US5686509 | US2006020076 | US20020236315 | US20020098952 | US20030337446 | US20010939152 | US19990459756 | US20020409625 | US20010333273 | US20010317201 |