EP2049674 - CONVERSION SYSTEMS FOR BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xyleco, Inc. 360 Audubon Road Wakefield, MA 01880-6248 / US | [2015/46] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Xyleco, Inc. 271 Salem Street, Unit L Woburn MA 01801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDOFF, Marshall 90 Addington Road Brookline, Massachusetts 02146 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Nicolai Von Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07840465.4 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US74028 | Priority number, date | US20060832735P | 21.07.2006 Original published format: US 832735 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008011598 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049674 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/06 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C12P7/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12P7/14 (CN,IL,US);
C12P7/10 (CN,IL,KR,US);
C12M1/00 (KR);
C12P13/00 (CN);
C12P13/001 (IL,US);
C12P19/30 (CN);
C12P19/34 (CN,IL,US);
C12P19/38 (CN);
C12P21/00 (CN,IL,US);
C12P33/00 (CN,IL,US);
C12P5/00 (CN,IL,US);
C12P5/023 (CN,IL,US);
C12P7/16 (CN);
C12P7/64 (IL,US);
C12P7/649 (CN);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON BIOMASSE | [2009/17] | English: | CONVERSION SYSTEMS FOR BIOMASS | [2009/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CONVERSION DE BIOMASSE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 21.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2016 | 15.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/14] | Appeal following examination | 18.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T2546/17 | 08.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.04.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | EP17191085.4 / EP3279329 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3330094 (CUERTEN JOHANNES DIPL ING) [X] 14-23 * the whole document * [I] 1-13; | [XI]EP0307500 (INREVERS VERWALTUNGS G M B H [DE]) [X] 14-23 * the whole document * [I] 1-13; | [XI]US5656491 (CASSANI GIOVANNI RODOLFO [IT], et al) [X] 14-23 * the whole document * * claims 1,2 * * column 2, line 65 - line 67 *[I] 1-13; | [XI]DE19958142 (SCHMACK BIOGAS GMBH [DE]) [X] 14-23 * the whole document * [I] 1-13 | International search | [X] - STEVENS R.W., "On the Storage of Ships and their Cargoes", (1958), XP008131263 | Examination | SE8506080 | US2008029447 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 32, Database accession no. 1987-226771, & SE8506080 A 19870621 (SALENIA AB) | - "Proposal #81-PA-0303-P-33,276 Grant#DE FG 43-81 R308093", (19850501), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.osti.gov/bridge/servlets/purl/6052193-gxSAHt/ | - e-mail from Ms. Cathrine Pepmiller | by applicant | DE3330094 | SE8506080L | EP0307500 | DE19958142 |