06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
29.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
17.02.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.02.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.02.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
11.10.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
12.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
13.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
17.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
09.10.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
18.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.03.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
13.03.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
21.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.01.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|