EP2069541 - POLYMORPHISMS IN GENES AFFECTING CNS DISORDERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2012/24] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation 1216 Kinnear Road Columbus, OH 43212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SADEE, Wolfgang 2324 Oxford Road Upper Arlington, OH 43221-4049 / US | 02 /
SAFFEN, David 396 West 7th Avenue Columbus, OH 43201 / US | 03 /
PINSONNEAULT, Julia 4312 Ingham Avenue Columbus, OH 43214 / US | 04 /
PAPP, Audrey 1526 Ardwick Road Columbus, OH 43220 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Ying 166 Old Brookfield Road, 26-2 Danbury, CT 06811 / US | 06 /
LIM, Jeong-Eun 2217 Hedgerow Road, Unit H Columbus, OH 43220 / US | 07 /
WANG, Danxin 2335 Cranford Road Upper Arlington, OH 43221 / US | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07840647.7 | 01.08.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US75010 | Priority number, date | US20060821077P | 01.08.2006 Original published format: US 821077 P | US20070926932P | 30.04.2007 Original published format: US 926932 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008017002 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2069541 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMORPHISMEN IN GENEN MIT EINFLUSS AUF ERKRANKUNGEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | [2009/25] | English: | POLYMORPHISMS IN GENES AFFECTING CNS DISORDERS AND USES THEREOF | [2009/25] | French: | POLYMORPHISMES DANS DES GENES AFFECTANT DES TROUBLES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 29.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2016 | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/15] | 01.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 01.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - HARVEY M ET AL., "Support for the involvement of TPH2 gene in affective disorders", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 980 - 983, XP002576232 [X] 1-3,9,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 4-8,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mp.4001557 | [XDY] - ZILL P ET AL., "SNP and haplotype analysis of a novel tryptophan hydroxylase isoform (TPH2) gene provide evidence for association with major depression", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 1030 - 1036, XP002576233 [XD] 1,2,9,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mp.4001525 | [XY] - ZILL P ET AL, "Single nucleotide polymorphism and haplotype analysis of a novel tryptophan hydroxylase Isoform (TPH2) gene in suicide victims", BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.BIOPSYCH.2004.07.015, (20041015), vol. 56, no. 8, ISSN 0006-3223, pages 581 - 586, XP004604210 [X] 1,2,9,12-15 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2004.07.015 | [Y] - DOMSCHKE K ET AL., "Association analysis of the monoamine oxidase A and B genes with attention deficit hyperactivity disorder (ADHD) in an Irish sample: Preferential disorder of the MAO-A 941G allele to affected children", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS PART B, (2005), vol. 134B, pages 110 - 114, XP002576234 [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ajmg.b.30158 | [A] - JANSSON M ET AL., "MAOA haplotypes associated with thrombocyte-MAO activity", BMC GENETICS, (2005), vol. 6, page 46, XP002576235 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2156-6-46 | [XP] - LIM J-E ET AL., "Tryptophan hydroxylase 2 (TPH2) haplotypes predict levels of TPH2 mRNA expression in human pons", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (200706), vol. 12, pages 491 - 501, XP002576236 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.MP.4001923 | International search | [X] - XU Q. ET AL, "Association Study of an SNP combination pattern in the dopaminergic pathway in paranoid schizophrenia - a novel strategy for complex disorders", MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 510 - 521, XP008103490 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.MP.4001472 | [A] - SNP, Database accession no. (rs6323), XP008103448 | [A] - NI ET AL., "Monoamine oxidase A gene is associated with borderline personality disorder", PSYCHIATRIC GENETICS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 153 - 157, XP008103479 | [A] - PINSONNEAULT J.K. ET AL, "Allelic mRNA expression of X-linked monoamine oxidase a (MAOA) in human brian: dissection of epigenetic and genetic factors", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (2006), vol. 15, no. 17, pages 2636 - 2649, XP008103491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/HMG/DDL192 | Examination | - ZHOU Z ET AL., "Haplotype-based linkage of tryptophan hydroxylase 2 to suicide attempt, major depression, and cerobrospinal fluid 5-hydroxyindoleacetic acid in 4 populations", ARCHIVES GENETIC PSYCHIATRY, (200510), vol. 62, pages 1109 - 1118 | by applicant | - HARVEY ET AL., MOLECULAR PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 980 - 983 | - ZILL ET AL., BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, (2004), vol. 56, no. 8, pages 581 - 586 | - DOMSCHKE ET AL., AM. J. MEDICAL GENETICS, (2005), vol. 134B, pages 110 - 114 | - CARREL, L.; WILLARD, H., NATURE, (2005), vol. 434, pages 400 - 404 | - SANDOVICI, I. ET AL., "A longitudinal study of X-inactivation ratio in human females", HUM. GENET., (2004), vol. 115, pages 387 - 392 |