EP2047633 - A METHOD AND APPLIANCE FOR USING A DYNAMIC RESPONSE TIME TO DETERMINE RESPONSIVENESS OF NETWORK SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citrix Systems, Inc. 851 W. Cypress Creek Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJA, Murali Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
KONDAMURU, Ravi Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
SUGANTHI, Josephine Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great Ameriva Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 04 /
VERZUNOV, Sergey Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 05 /
KAMATH, Sandeep Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 06 /
SHETTY, Anil Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
RAJA, Murali Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
02 /
KONDAMURU, Ravi Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
03 /
SUGANTHI, Josephine Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great Ameriva Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
04 /
VERZUNOV, Sergey Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
05 /
KAMATH, Sandeep Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
06 /
SHETTY, Anil Citrix Silicon Valley 4988 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/44] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Armstrong, Rosemary Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07840658.4 | 02.08.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US75068 | Priority number, date | US20060462344 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: US 462344 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008017026 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047633 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047633 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04L41/5009 (EP,US);
H04L43/0852 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG UM UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER DYNAMISCHEN ANTWORTZEIT DAS ANTWORTVERHALTEN VON NETZWERKDIENSTEN ZU BESTIMMEN | [2009/16] | English: | A METHOD AND APPLIANCE FOR USING A DYNAMIC RESPONSE TIME TO DETERMINE RESPONSIVENESS OF NETWORK SERVICES | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'UTILISER LE TEMPS DE RÉPONSE DYNAMIQUE POUR MESURER LA RÉACTIVITÉ DE SERVICES RÉSEAU | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 16.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2007 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | IT | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | IE | 02.08.2018 | LU | 02.08.2018 | MT | 02.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 02.08.2007 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 02.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.08.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 02.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.08.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 02.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.08.2018 | ||
MT | 02.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 02.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
IE | 02.08.2018 | ||
LU | 02.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
LU | 02.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5459837 (CACCAVALE FRANK S [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 5, lines 3-25 * * column 7, lines 5-27 * * column 10, lines 18-22 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP1065827 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] *; | [A]US6571285 (GROATH STEVE G [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * figures 2,10,17,18 * * paragraph [0941] * * paragraph [1040] * * paragraphs [1849] - [1855] * * paragraphs [1872] , [1873] ** claim 1 *; | [A] - ALLEN M S ET AL, "Adaptive timeout discovery using the network weather service", HIGH PERFORMANCE DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING, 2002. HPDC-11 2002. PROCEEDINGS. 11TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON 23-26 JULY 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020723), ISBN 0-7695-1686-6, pages 35 - 41, XP010601159 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |