EP2062449 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING GRANT CHANNELS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDBY, Stein, Arne 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
CHAPONNIERE, Etienne, F. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07841236.8 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007US76586 | Priority number, date | US20060839514P | 22.08.2006 Original published format: US 839514 P | US20060849198P | 03.10.2006 Original published format: US 849198 P | US20070842878 | 21.08.2007 Original published format: US 842878 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008024889 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2062449 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/14, // H04W72/04, H04W88/02 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (KR);
H04B17/40 (KR);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | H04W88/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/22] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG VON GEWÄHRUNGSKANÄLEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING GRANT CHANNELS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2009/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DES CANAUX D'OCTROI DANS UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/22] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG ZULÄSSIGER KANALE IN DER FUNKKOMMUNIKATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2016 | 05.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/34] | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004196820 (HSU LIANGCHI [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0072] *; | [XY]WO2005018270 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,13-16,18,19,23,24,28,29 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0157] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0174] * * paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0220] * * figure 9 * [Y] 9,20,25,30; | [Y]EP1557968 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9,20,25,30 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0115] * * figures 1-14 *; | [XP] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Monitoring of HSUPA grant channels", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 MEETING #46, Tallinn, Estonia, (20060828), no. R1-062152, pages 1 - 3, XP002466501 [XP] 1-38 * the whole document * | [XP] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Monitoring of HSUPA grant channels", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING#54, Tallinn, Estonia, (20060828), no. R1-062393, pages 1 - 3, XP002466502 [XP] 1-38 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004029586 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070601), no. V7.5.0, pages 1 - 141, XP050367710 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Physical layer procedures (FDD) (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.214, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070501), no. V7.5.0, pages 1 - 84, XP050366876 |