EP2066569 - CHILLED TOPPING DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICH PRODUCTS CORPORATION 1150 Niagara Street Buffalo New York 14213 / US | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALLER, James 8208 Fernleaf Court Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | 02 /
TIRONE, Christopher, V. 25 Park Place East Aurora, NY 14052 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Avery 10 Elcona Avenue Middle Sackville, NS B4E 3B5 / CA | 04 /
ERMAN, Gregory Site 4, Box 11, R.R. 2 Head of Chezzetcook, NS B4E 3B1 / CA | 05 /
RICKER, David, A. 520 High Road Fall River, Nova Scotia B2T 1Z6 / CA | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07841462.0 | 28.08.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US76983 | Priority number, date | US20060841064P | 30.08.2006 Original published format: US 841064 P | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008027884 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066569 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/28, B67D7/02, B67D1/00 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
B67D1/0001 (EP,US);
B67D1/08 (KR);
B65D35/28 (KR);
B65D35/56 (KR);
B67D7/0227 (EP,US);
B67D7/80 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | B65D35/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT GEKÜHLTER BESCHICHTUNG | [2009/24] | English: | CHILLED TOPPING DISPENSER | [2009/24] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE GARNITURE GLACÉE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9218419 (CHOI MIN K [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]US5553740 (KING KENYON M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 24-60; figure - *; | [X]WO9806659 (RESTAURANT AUTOMATION DEV CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 25; figure - *; | [XI]US6131766 (KING KENYON M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,20 * column 6, line 8 - column 9, line 44; figures 1-18 * [I] 14-17; | [XI]WO0117892 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,9,10,21-23 * page 8, line 4 - page 10, line 7; figures 1, 2, 20 * [I] 11; | [A]US6264066 (VINCENT MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2005167444 (SANFILIPPO JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]WO2005079444 (CLEAR LAM PACKAGING INC [US], et al) [A] 21 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5215218 (CHOI MIN K [US]); | [A]US6196420 (GUTIERREZ ANTONIO [US], et al); | [A]US6345734 (SCHALOW STEPHAN M [US], et al); | [X]US6691894 (CHRISMAN RANDALL C [US], et al) | by applicant | WO9806659 | US6131766 |